Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3314749

EP3314749 - CABLE TERMINATION FOR SOLAR JUNCTION BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MOSTOLLER, Matthew Edward
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US
02 / SHAFFER, Jeffrey W.
4665 Spring Road
Shermans Dale, Pennsylvania 17090 / US
 [2018/18]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/18]
Application number, filing date16735783.922.06.2016
[2018/18]
WO2016US38604
Priority number, dateUS20151475367529.06.2015         Original published format: US201514753675
[2018/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017003774
Date:05.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3314749
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02S40/34
[2018/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/18]
TitleGerman:KABELABSCHLUSS FÜR SOLARANSCHLUSSKASTEN[2018/18]
English:CABLE TERMINATION FOR SOLAR JUNCTION BOX[2018/18]
French:EXTRÉMITÉ DE CÂBLE POUR BOÎTE DE JONCTION SOLAIRE[2018/18]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2018National basic fee paid 
22.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/18]
22.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0030216  (UTILUX PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 10, line 10 - page 16, line 9; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US2005230140  (HIGASHIKOZONO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2012329309  (WEAVER JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-5,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2015053251  (HOPF MARKUS [DE]) [A] 1-5,14 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-5 *