Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466088

EP3466088 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERSONAL MULTIMEDIA CONTENT DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RHOADS, Steven
140 Parkview Road
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
02 / STRACHOTA, Douglas
8141 N. Meridian Street
Indianapolis, Indiana 46260 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Morain, David
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16735788.822.06.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US38672
Priority number, dateUS201662342241P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342241 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204836
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466088
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/262, H04N21/436, H04N21/45, H04N21/214, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2347, H04N21/236, H04N21/2362, H04N21/2665, H04N21/2668, H04N21/426, H04N21/434
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERTEILUNG VON PERSÖNLICHEM MULTIMEDIAINHALT[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERSONAL MULTIMEDIA CONTENT DISTRIBUTION[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA PERSONNEL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
26.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.201903   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009222858  (HJELM JOHAN [JP], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 17] , [0 19] , [0 31] , [0 35] , [0 38] * * figures 1-7 * * claim 9 *;
 [I]WO0115455  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [I] 1-28 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2015237389  (GROUF NICHOLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 177] * * figures 1-13 *;
 [A]US2011113441  (JEONG YOUNG SIC [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2010017824  (MALIK DALE [US]) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]WO2013045123  (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2012272263  (SHARMA SUDHANSHU [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2012269207  (JANG YONG-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-23 *