Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3307659

EP3307659 - UNSTACKING DEVICE HAVING A VIEWING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / EL BERNOUSSI, Hicham
66, rue d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
02 / TELUOB, Jean-Marc
32bis Impasse la Mure
07130 Cornas / FR
03 / AMBROISE, Stéphane
7 Lotissement L'Orée du Rhône
26600 Serves Sur Rhone / FR
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2018/16]
Application number, filing date16735909.003.06.2016
[2018/16]
WO2016FR51338
Priority number, dateFR2015005531511.06.2015         Original published format: FR 1555315
[2018/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016198769
Date:15.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3307659
Date:18.04.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016
[2018/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3307659
Date:20.02.2019
Language:FR
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65H1/02, B65H7/14
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTSTAPELUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT BETRACHTUNGSSYSTEM[2018/16]
English:UNSTACKING DEVICE HAVING A VIEWING SYSTEM[2018/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉPILAGE AVEC SYSTÈME DE VISION[2018/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2018National basic fee paid 
11.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/16]
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.01.2019Fee for grant paid
02.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
Former [2019/46]HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]LT20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
Former [2019/37]LT20.02.2019
GR21.05.2019
Former [2019/33]LT20.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[IA]EP2292539  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [A]US2014271087  (BROWN JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1902989  (SOLYSTIC [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0026861  (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2292539
 US2014271087