Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3320272

EP3320272 - HUMIDIFYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dyson Technology Limited
Tetbury Hill
Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB
[2018/20]
Inventor(s)01 / DUVALL, Thomas
c/o Dyson Technology Limited
Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB
02 / COWEN, Daniel
c/o Dyson Technology Limited
Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB
03 / PINKSTONE, Adam
c/o Dyson Technology Limited
Tetbury Hill
Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Chapman, Alan Gareth , et al
Dyson Technology Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Tetbury Hill
Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB
[2018/20]
Application number, filing date16736219.330.06.2016
[2018/20]
WO2016GB51959
Priority number, dateGB2015001189707.07.2015         Original published format: GB 201511897
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017006085
Date:12.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3320272
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24F6/12, F24F6/14
[2018/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
TitleGerman:BEFEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/20]
English:HUMIDIFYING APPARATUS[2018/20]
French:APPAREIL D'HUMIDIFICATION[2018/20]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2018National basic fee paid 
15.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
15.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]JP2010038413  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP; MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC HOME APPL) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-10
 [XI]WO2013132222  (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-10
 [XI]JPH10132272  (HITACHI HOME TEC LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-10