Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3314133

EP3314133 - FASTENING DEVICE WITH HIGH PULL-OUT STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. RAYMOND et Cie
111-113 et 115 Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2018/18]
Inventor(s)01 / DE MARCO, Sébastien
Route des Egaux, Lot. St Hugues
38380 Saint Pierre de Chartreuse / FR
02 / ALBARAN, Jean-François
3 Impasse de la Pommeraie
38760 Varces / FR
 [2018/18]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2018/18]
Application number, filing date16736906.521.06.2016
[2018/18]
WO2016FR51504
Priority number, dateFR2015005573923.06.2015         Original published format: FR 1555739
[2018/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016207531
Date:29.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3314133
Date:02.05.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/06, B60R13/02, F16B21/18
[2018/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/18]
TitleGerman:BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT HOHER AUSZIEHFESTIGKEIT[2018/18]
English:FASTENING DEVICE WITH HIGH PULL-OUT STRENGTH[2018/18]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION A HAUTE RESISTANCE A L'ARRACHEMENT[2018/18]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2018National basic fee paid 
23.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/18]
19.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO9635344  (PRYM WILLIAM GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,12 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph last - page 10, paragraph 1 * [A] 6,7,9 [I] 2-5,10,11;
 [AD]FR2981135  (ITW DE FRANCE [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2104150  (WOJCINSKI, ALLAN STEFAN) [A] 1 * figures 6-11 *;
 [A]EP1493629  (ITW FIXFAST AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figures 5-9 *
by applicantEP1360420
 US6254302
 EP1577567
 FR2981135