Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3246307

EP3246307 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIAMINE PRECURSOR COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Chemical Corporation
5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2018/38]
Former [2017/47]For all designated states
Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
7-1 Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAGAO, Masato
c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd.
Materials Research Laboratories
488-6 Suzumi-cho
Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP
 [2017/47]
Representative(s)Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[2017/47]
Application number, filing date16737381.013.01.2016
[2017/47]
WO2016JP50851
Priority number, dateJP2015000436613.01.2015         Original published format: JP 2015004366
[2017/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016114310
Date:21.07.2016
Language:JA
[2016/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3246307
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3246307
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07C201/12, C07C205/42
[2017/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DIAMINVORLÄUFERVERBINDUNG[2017/47]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING DIAMINE PRECURSOR COMPOUND[2017/47]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ PRÉCURSEUR DE DIAMINE[2017/47]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2017Translation filed 
07.08.2017National basic fee paid 
07.08.2017Search fee paid 
07.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
07.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2019Fee for grant paid
14.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JP2014006442  (JSR CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; synthesis example Al-6 & KR 10-2013-0133661 A & CN 103450479 A *;
 [Y]JPS6025955  (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; page 1, right column, lines 5 to 11; examples (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2008133262  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0048] to [0053] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007204438  (KAWASAKI KASEI CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; paragraph [0015] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2005112764  (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims; examples; paragraph [0018] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2014208609  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * , synthesis example 4-1 & TW 201518407 A *
 [Y]  - ALLEN R. BANKS et al., "A Convenient Synthesis of Methacrylates", J. Org. Chem., (19770000), vol. 42, no. 24, pages 3965 - 3966, XP055466949 [Y] 1-9 * , p 3966 General Procedure *