Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3245460

EP3245460 - BEVERAGE COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pepsico, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2017/47]
Inventor(s)01 / JAFA, Emad
c/o PepsiCo Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, New York 10577 / US
02 / VERBITSKY, Mikhail
2003 Central Street
Stoughton, Massachusetts 02072 / US
03 / BALANEV, Andrey
73 Grazdansky Avenue
Apt. 147
St. Petersburg 195257 / RU
04 / MARTSINOVSKIY, Georgy
69 Engelsa Avenue
Apt. 82
St. Petersburg 194017 / RU
05 / ABASHKIN, Vasilii
97 Svetlanovsky Avenue
Apt. 193
St. Petersburg 195269 / RU
 [2017/47]
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/47]Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date16737872.814.01.2016
[2017/47]
WO2016US13382
Priority number, dateUS20151459771815.01.2015         Original published format: US201514597718
[2017/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016115331
Date:21.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3245460
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:F25D31/00, // F25B21/02
[2018/37]
Former International [2017/47]F25D23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/47]
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKEKÜHLUNG[2017/47]
English:BEVERAGE COOLING[2017/47]
French:REFROIDISSEMENT DE BOISSON[2017/47]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2017National basic fee paid 
07.07.2017Search fee paid 
07.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
07.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2009038317  (OTEY ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 37] , [0 52] * [A] 10-15;
 [XI]US5720171  (OSTERHOFF MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * [I] 9;
 [XI]KR100775518B  (TEAM KOREA INC [KR]) [X] 10,14 * abstract * [I] 1,2,5,7-9,11-13,15;
 [I]KR20060114593  (ORIENCES UNION CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,5-7,9-11,14 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2009056369  (FINK HARVEY S [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6, 7, 9-14, 16 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2061427  (KING JESSE G) [Y] 1-4, 6, 7, 9-14, 16 * entire document *;
 [Y]US6412286  (PARK RAE-EUN [KR], et al) [Y] 2, 12 * entire document *;
 [Y]US4417450  (MORGAN JR ANNIS R [US], et al) [Y] 9, 16 * entire document *;
 [A]US4910976  (DRUMMOND III CHARLES S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010293970  (MOOIJER RONALD JOHANNES [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012016524  (SPICER LUCAS BRYANT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *