Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3319664

EP3319664 - AN INJECTOR COMPRISING A SAFETY PIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.07.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALK-Abelló A/S
Bøge Allé 6-8
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2018/20]
Inventor(s)01 / MIKKELSEN, Jens
Søndervej 13A
2750 Ballerup / DK
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2018/20]
Application number, filing date16738139.111.07.2016
[2018/20]
WO2016EP66423
Priority number, dateEP2015017627810.07.2015         Original published format: EP 15176278
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017009284
Date:19.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3319664
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/20, A61M5/32
[2018/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
TitleGerman:INJEKTOR MIT EINER SICHERHEITSNADEL[2018/20]
English:AN INJECTOR COMPRISING A SAFETY PIN[2018/20]
French:INJECTEUR COMPORTANT UNE GOUPILLE DE SÉCURITÉ[2018/20]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2017National basic fee paid 
28.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/20]
25.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO8601120  (SURVIVAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * pages 13-18; figures 1-2, 5-6, 17 * [I] 10-13;
 [XI]WO2012031627  (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 14-21; figure - * [I] 12;
 [X]US2010152659  (STREIT URSINA [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0025] - [0 58] - [0066]; figure - *;
 [A]WO2009097934  (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 13-15; figure - *;
 [A]WO2007002052  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 10-15; figure 6 *;
 [A]WO2011039212  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 8-20; figure - *;
 [AD]US2011125100  (SCHWIRTZ ANDREAS [AT], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *