Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465605

EP3465605 - A COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR REDUCING VIDEO LATENCY OF A COMPUTER VIDEO PROCESSING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
08.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Picturall Oy
Harjutie 14
69600 Kaustinen / FI
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VALO, Samuli
Harjutie 14
69600 Kaustinen / FI
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu
Isokatu 32
90100 Oulu / FI
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16738836.227.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016FI50372
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203096
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465605
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T1/20
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER VIDEOLATENZ EINES COMPUTERVIDEOVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEMS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT DAFÜR[2019/15]
English:A COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR REDUCING VIDEO LATENCY OF A COMPUTER VIDEO PROCESSING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THERETO[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR RÉDUIRE UNE LATENCE VIDÉO D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT VIDÉO INFORMATISÉ ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2018National basic fee paid 
04.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
04.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005012749  (GONZALEZ NELSON [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0054]; figures 2,4 *;
 [I]US2010246662  (KOTO SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] *;
 [A]US9247264  (FRANCHE JEAN-FRANCOIS [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 11, line 3 - line 22 *;
 [A]US2008211816  (GONZALEZ NELSON [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]  - KNISS J ET AL, "Interactive texture-based volume rendering for large data sets", vol. 21, no. 4, (20010731), pages 52 - 61, IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, URL: http://www.sci.utah.edu/publications/jmk01/TRex_CGA.pdf, (20160324), XP002755908 [A] 1-16 * figures 3,7,8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.933524