EP3185072 - ACTION CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE Holdings (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Room 1102 Layer 10, Building 3 105 Yaojiayuan Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | For all designated states Letv Sports Culture Develop(Beijing) Co., Ltd Room 1103 Building 3 105 Yaojiayuan Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dalong Room 1103 Layer 10 Building 3 105 Yaojiayuan Road, ChaoYang District Beijing 100025 / CN | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16739390.9 | 12.05.2016 | [2017/26] | WO2016CN81909 | Priority number, date | CN20151671820 | 13.10.2015 Original published format: CN201510671820 | [2017/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017063361 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185072 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56, H04N5/225 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G03B17/561 (EP,CN,KR);
G03B17/566 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIONSKAMERAVORRICHTUNG | [2017/26] | English: | ACTION CAMERA | [2017/26] | French: | CAMÉRA D'ACTION | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2016 | Translation filed | 28.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202004016627U (REMPEL HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009091597 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0053] , [0068] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2,14-16 *; | [XA]US2012057027 (WU JIPING [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0106]; figures 1-5; claims 1-15 * [A] 2-12 | International search | [Y]DE202004016627U (REMPEL HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 1-3, 12 * , description, paragraphs [0001]-[0006], and figure 1 *; | [Y]DE202007004597U (KAISER FOTOTECHNIK GMBH & CO K [DE]) [Y] 1-3, 12 * , description, paragraphs [0035]-[0045], and figures 1-16. *; | [A]CN200940774Y (MAO JINCAN [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN201562113U (SHENZHEN AEE WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12* , the whole document *; | [A]CN203131442U (LI WANJING, et al) [A] 1-12 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN204810390U (SHENZHEN AEE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1 * , description, paragraphs [0021]-[0028], and figures 1-6 *; | [E]CN205247040U (LETV SPORTS CULTURE DEVELOPMENT BEIJING CO LTD ) [E] 1-12 * , claims 1-13 * |