Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3248159

EP3248159 - SECURE PROCESSING OF ELECTRONIC PAYMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Royal Bank of Canada
1 Place Ville Marie 6th Floor North Wing
Montreal, QC H3C 3A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2017/48]For all designated states
Royal Bank Of Canada
1 Place Ville Marie 6th Floor North Wing
Montreal, QC H3C 3A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / ORTIZ, Edison U.
1 Place Ville-Marie 6th Floor
North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
02 / LEE, Terry W.
1 Place Ville-Marie 6th Floor
North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
03 / WOO, Gabriel Y.
1 Place Ville-Marie 6th Floor
North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
04 / SCOTT, Stephen James
1 Place Ville-Marie 6th Floor
North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
05 / YIN, Weiqiang
1 Place Ville-Marie 6th Floor
North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
06 / LAM, Chai
1 Place Ville Marie
6th Floor, North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
07 / DINN, Judy
1 Place Ville Marie
6th Floor, North Wing
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3A9 / CA
 [2017/48]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/48]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date16739695.119.01.2016
[2017/48]
WO2016CA00014
Priority number, dateUS201562105061P19.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562105061 P
US201562188067P02.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562188067 P
US201562200859P04.08.2015         Original published format: US 201562200859 P
[2017/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016115620
Date:28.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3248159
Date:29.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016
[2017/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA28.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/38, G06Q20/36, G06Q20/40, H04L12/14, H04L9/08, H04L9/32
[2017/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/48]
TitleGerman:SICHERE VERARBEITUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN ZAHLUNGEN[2017/48]
English:SECURE PROCESSING OF ELECTRONIC PAYMENTS[2017/48]
French:TRAITEMENT SÉCURISÉ DE PAIEMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES[2017/48]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2017National basic fee paid 
05.07.2017Search fee paid 
05.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/48]
05.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
22.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.05.2019Request for further processing filed
22.05.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.06.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012316992  (OBORNE TIMOTHY W [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014025958  (CALMAN MATTHEW A [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013339188  (MOHAMED RIAZ EBRAHIM [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]CA2830260  (ROYAL BANK OF CANADA [CA]) [X] 1-5, 11-15 * See paragraphs 5, 9, 13, 17, 18, 21-23, 43, 48, 71; page 24 - first paragraph; paragraph 81-first and fourth bullets; paragraphs 97-102, 109-112, 114, 115, 120-123, 135, 137, 141-143, 154-156, 159, 202. *;
 [A]US2012030044  (HURST DOUGLAS J [US]) [A] * See abstract; claims 1, 3, 4, 6; paragraphs 24, 25, 27, 28, 31, 32, 40-43, 45, 48-53, 59-63, 68. *;;
 [A]CA2890335  (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] * See abstract. *;;
 [A]CA2858203  (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) [A] * See paragraphs 26, 34-36, 48, 111, 113. *;;
 [A]CA2852059  (C SAM INC [US]) [A] * See paragraphs 385, 386, 396-399, 400, 422, 426, 418, 430, 505, 506. *;;
 WO2012021864  [ ] (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [ ] * See paragraphs 9, 10, 28, 37, 38. *;;
 US2015012428  [ ] (GRAY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [ ] * See abstract; paragraphs 12-14, 3346. *;