blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3234845

EP3234845 - MODEL ANTI-COLLUSION WATERMARK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Group Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
For all designated states
Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
10202 W. Washington Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 / US
[2021/30]
Former [2017/43]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
For all designated states
Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
10202 W. Washington Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DIEHL, Eric
10202 West Washington Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date16740864.022.01.2016
[2017/43]
WO2016US14595
Priority number, dateUS201562107230P23.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562107230 P
US20161500369021.01.2016         Original published format: US201615003690
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016118904
Date:28.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234845
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3234845
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.07.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/16, G06T1/00, G09C5/00, H04L9/32
[2018/35]
CPC:
G06T1/005 (EP,KR,US); G06T1/0021 (KR,US); G09C5/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/32 (EP,KR,US); G06T2201/0063 (EP,KR,US); H04L2209/34 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2209/606 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/43]G06F21/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODELL-ANTIKOLLUSIONSWASSERZEICHEN[2017/43]
English:MODEL ANTI-COLLUSION WATERMARK[2017/43]
French:FILIGRANE ANTI-COLLUSION MODÈLE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2017National basic fee paid 
18.07.2017Search fee paid 
18.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
18.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2023
20.09.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
03.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2024Fee for grant paid
22.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005044370  (OOSTVEEN JOB CORNELIS [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 2-4 *;
 [X]US7047413  (YACOBI YACOV [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 1 - line 20 * * column 14, line 18 - line 52 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]WO2009077944  (CIVOLUTION BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 32 * * page 5, line 7 - line 18 * * page 6, line 15 - line 33 * * figures 3,4,5 *;
 [X]US2012163583  (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0079] *;
 [X]US2013136296  (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] ** paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [X]  - DITTMANN J, "COMBINING DIGITAL WATERMARKS AND COLLUSION SECURE FINGERPRINTS FOR CUSTOMER COPY MONITORING", IEE SEMINAR ON SECURE IMAGES AND IMAGE AUTHENTICATION, IEE, LONDON, GB, (20000410), pages 6/01 - 6/06, XP001151849 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2 * * page 4 * * page 6 *
 [X]  - JOHNSON A ET AL, TRANSFORM PERMUTED WATERMARKING FOR COPYRIGHT PROTECTION OF DIGITAL VIDEO, IEEE GLOBECOM 1998. GLOBECOM '98. THE BRIDGE TO GLOBAL INTEGRATION. SYDNEY, NOV. 8 - 12, 1998; [IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 684 - 689, (19980101), ISBN 978-0-7803-4985-8, XP000825846 [X] 1-11,15 * abstract * * page 685 * * page 686 *
International search[Y]US2002114459  (BELENKO VYACHESLAV S [RU], et al) [Y] 5, 6, 13, 16 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0028], [0030]. *;
 [XY]US2012163583  (NAKAGATA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4, 7-12, 14, 15, 17, 18 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0042], [0043], [0046], [0099], [0100]. * [Y] 5, 6, 13, 16;
 [A]US2013011006  (PETROVIC RADE [US], et al) [A] 1-18* ; entire document. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.