Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469421

EP3469421 - AUTOMATED PORTABLE PHOTOGRAPHIC DEVICE CONNECTABLE TO A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Couston, Olivier
26 rue du Mont Blanc
1060 Saint Gilles / BE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet HERRBURGER
115, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16741065.308.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016FR51368
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212122
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469421
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/53, H04N1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:MIT EINEM NETZWERK VERBINDBARE AUTOMATISIERTE TRAGBARE FOTOGRAFIEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:AUTOMATED PORTABLE PHOTOGRAPHIC DEVICE CONNECTABLE TO A NETWORK[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF PHOTOGRAPHIQUE PORTATIF AUTOMATISE ET CONNECTABLE A UN RESEAU[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2013243413  (CHOI EMILY [US]) [A] 7 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2,8,9 *
 [A]US2006083500  (KITO EIICHI [JP]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 46]; figure 1 *
 [Y]US2014375828  (MILLER JAMES KENNETH [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0109]; figures 1-3b, 8a-8c *
 [A]US6429892  (PARKER JAMES T [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]US8737828  (BORJA REY [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]US5587740  (BRENNAN JAMES M [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 36 - column 4, line 60 *
 [Y]WO9623386  (POLAROID CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *
 [E]FR3033652  (COUSTON OLIVIER [BE]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document *