Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3342194

EP3342194 - AUGMENTING REALITY USING A SMALL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / DAS, Soumya
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / PARK, Edwin, Chongwoo
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstraße 5
80538 München / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/27]Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date16745258.029.06.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016US40009
Priority number, dateUS20151483963828.08.2015         Original published format: US201514839638
[2018/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017039813
Date:09.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3342194
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017
[2018/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3342194
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02
[2019/20]
Former International [2018/27]H04W4/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERWEITERUNG DER REALITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KLEINZELLE[2018/27]
English:AUGMENTING REALITY USING A SMALL CELL[2018/27]
French:AUGMENTATION DE LA RÉALITÉ À L'AIDE D'UNE PETITE CELLULE[2018/27]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2018National basic fee paid 
12.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
12.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2019Fee for grant paid
30.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2015133091  (BALDWIN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,12-16,19,21,23-26,28-30 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraph 37 - page 4, paragraph 56 * * page 5, paragraph 65 * [Y] 6,7,17,18,27 [I] 9,11,20,22;
 [I]US6731940  (NAGENDRAN UDAY [US]) [I] 1,12,23,28 * abstract * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 10 *;
 [Y]EP2239967  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6,7,17,18,27 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 16 - column 6, paragraph 21 *