Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3324941

EP3324941 - SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING HCV [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2018/22]
Inventor(s)01 / ASMUS, Katharin
Hambacher Strasse 7
D-67434 Neustadt a.d.w. / DE
02 / GAO, Yi
210 East Baltusrol Drive
Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US
03 / GARRETT, Colleen
4510 Greenview Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60640 / US
04 / HACH, Harald
Weibenssurgenstrasse 2
76889 Oberotterbach / DE
05 / JAYASANKAR, Adivaraha
3504 Rolling Ridge Road
Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US
06 / KYEREMATENG, Samuel
Kaefertaler Strasse 61
68167 Mannheim / DE
07 / LANDER, Ute
Rotsteig 1
67814 Dannenfels / DE
08 / MUELLER, Thomas
Max-Planck-Ring 2a
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
09 / NARIS, Marius
1471 Wood Avenue
Downers Grove, Illinois 60515 / US
10 / OBERMILLER, Constanze
Kurfuersten-Anlage 45
68115 Heidelberg / DE
11 / REUL, Regina
Seckenheimer Strasse 23
68165 Mannheim / DE
12 / SCHNEIDER, Katrin
Schwarzwaldstrasse 8
68163 Mannheim / DE
13 / SEVER, Nancy
1912 Alexandra Court
Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US
14 / SIIMON, Michael
Unterest Rappenfeld 78
76829 Landau / DE
15 / STEITZ, Benedikt
Freinsheimer Strasse
67169 Kallstadt / DE
16 / TONG, Ping
1 Charbourg Court
Potomoc, Maryland 20854 / US
17 / WESTEDT, Ulrich
Weinheimber Strasse 2
69198 Schriesheim / DE
18 / ZHU, Donghua
259 W. Aspen Pointe Road
Vernon Hills, Illinois 60048 / US
 [2018/22]
Representative(s)Garner, Stephen , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/22]
Application number, filing date16745584.918.07.2016
[2018/22]
WO2016US42806
Priority number, dateUS201562193639P17.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562193639 P
US201662295309P15.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662295309 P
US20161519221124.06.2016         Original published format: US201615192211
[2018/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017015211
Date:26.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3324941
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K31/454, A61K31/498, A61P31/14
[2018/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Extension statesBA16.02.2018
ME16.02.2018
TitleGerman:FESTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HCV[2018/22]
English:SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING HCV[2018/22]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES SOLIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU VHC[2018/22]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2018National basic fee paid 
16.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
16.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
21.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
21.12.2018Request for further processing filed
21.12.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.2019Decision despatched
21.12.2018Request for further processing filed
21.12.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2014152514  (ABBVIE INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 25, paragraph 0062 *;
 [Y]US2014080868  (NG THERESEA IOK-CHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 5, paragraph 0041 - page 6, paragraph 0042 * * page 7, paragraph 0054 *
 [Y]  - LIN C-W ET AL, "P0715 : Steady-state pharmacokinetics and safety of coadministration of pan-genotypic, direct acting protease inhibitor, ABT-493 with pan-genotypic NS5A inhibitor, ABT-530, in healthy adult subjects", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, (201504), vol. 62, doi:10.1016/S0168-8278(15)30918-1, ISSN 0168-8278, page S592, XP029161804 [Y] 1-14 * table - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(15)30918-1
by applicantUS2012070416
 US2012220562