Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3310689

EP3310689 - PRE-OILED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CCL Label, Inc.
161 Worcester Road
Framingham, MA 01701 / US
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SAINT, Andre
13 Thames
Getzville, New York 14068 / US
02 / KRAUZE, Zbigniew
107 Pavement Road
Lancaster, New York 14086 / US
03 / SHAVER, William Patrick
9717 S. Protection Road
Holland, New York 14080 / US
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/17]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date16747649.817.06.2016
[2018/17]
WO2016US38077
Priority number, dateUS201562181562P18.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562181562 P
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016205649
Date:22.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3310689
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65D77/22
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
TitleGerman:VORGEÖLTES VENTIL[2018/17]
English:PRE-OILED VALVE[2018/17]
French:SOUPAPE PRÉHUILÉE[2018/17]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2017National basic fee paid 
29.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/17]
29.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201803   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2018
30.06.201904   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]EP1422163  (AMCOR FLEXIBLES EUROPE AS [DK]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * figures 3-5 *
 [A]US2012281933  (BEER JEFFREY SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0010] - [0036] * * figures 1-5 *
 [A]US2013048125  (HOFFMAN KARL K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0144] * * figures 10-12 *
 [A]EP1340695  (CELOMAT ETIQUETAS ESPECIALES S [AR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0014] * * figures 1, 2a, 2b *
 [A]WO2013009955  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]; GARDNER DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1c *