Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465641

EP3465641 - VENDING MACHINE OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marc S.R.L.
Via Dell'Industria 493/1
41058 Vignola Modena / IT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VALMORI, Rino
Via della Pieve 4
41058 Vignola Modena / IT
02 / MONARI, Alberto
Viale Monchio 75/01
41124 Vignola Modena / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Casadei, Giovanni
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via Vellani Marchi, 20
41124 Modena / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16747913.827.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016IT00138
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203546
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465641
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G07F11/22, G07F11/42
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERKAUFSAUTOMAT FÜR PRODUKTE[2019/15]
English:VENDING MACHINE OF PRODUCTS[2019/15]
French:MACHINE DISTRIBUTRICE DE PRODUITS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018National basic fee paid 
28.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2061011  (BIFFARELLA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0044]; figures 1,3; claims 1,3,8,11,16-18 *
 [A]WO2007009714  (DAINT S R L [IT]; GUGLIELMI ROBERTO [IT]; SCAPIN ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 6; claim 1 *
 [A]US5221023  (DUBIK ANDRE S [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *