Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468805

EP3468805 - HORIZONTAL INTERFACE FOR FLUID SUPPLY CARTRIDGE HAVING DIGITAL FLUID LEVEL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUMBIE, Michael, W.
11445 Compaq Center Dr. W
Houston, TX 77070 / US
02 / STUDER, Anthony, D.
11445 Compaq Center Dr. W
Houston, TX 77070 / US
03 / HARVEY, David, C.
11445 Compaq Center Dr. W
Houston, TX 77070 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16747984.927.07.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US44251
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018022038
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468805
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HORIZONTALE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHRKASSETTE MIT DIGITALEM FLÜSSIGKEITSSTANDSENSOR[2019/16]
English:HORIZONTAL INTERFACE FOR FLUID SUPPLY CARTRIDGE HAVING DIGITAL FLUID LEVEL SENSOR[2019/16]
French:INTERFACE HORIZONTALE POUR CARTOUCHE D'ALIMENTATION EN FLUIDE POURVUE D'UN CAPTEUR NUMÉRIQUE DE NIVEAU DE FLUIDE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAY]GB2321220  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,12 * page 1, lines 14-21 * * page 2, lines 1-5 * * page 3, lines 6-15, 23-28 * * page 4, lines 1-5, 10-17, 22-28 * * page 5, lines 6-7, 23-25 * * page 6, lines 1-11; figures 1, 2, 3 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3,7,11,14,15;
 [XY]EP1863645  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 13] , [0 14] , [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 45] , [0 63] , [0 64] , [0 65]; figures 1, 2, 3, 7, 17A-B * [Y] 7,11,14,15;
 [X]EP0994779  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 40] , [0 65]; figures 3, 5n, 12, 13 *;
 [I]EP2982514  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 19] , [0 34] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 54]; figures 1, 3B, 4, 5A-C *;
 [I]EP1281523  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 41] , [0 42] , [0 43]; figures 1, 3, 4 *;
 [YA]EP2103434  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 19] , [0 24] , [0 28]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 1,2