blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3331528

EP3331528 - MUSCARINIC AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.08.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington
Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
[2019/12]
Former [2018/24]For all designated states
Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark Broadwater Road Welwyn Garden City
Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Giles Albert
c/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
02 / CONGREVE, Miles Stuart
c/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
03 / PICKWORTH, Mark
c/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
04 / RACKHAM, Mark
c/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
05 / TEHAN, Benjamin Gerald
c/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
Granta Park
Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DG / GB
 [2021/23]
Former [2018/24]01 / BROWN, Giles Albert
C/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark
Broadwater Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
02 / CONGREVE, Miles Stuart
C/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark
Broadwater Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
03 / PICKWORTH, Mark
C/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark
Broadwater Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
04 / RACKHAM, Mark
C/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark
Broadwater Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
05 / TEHAN, Benjamin Gerald
C/o Heptares Therapeutics Limited
BioPark
Broadwater Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/24]Stratagem IPM Limited
Meridian Court
Comberton Road
Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB
Application number, filing date16750221.003.08.2016
[2018/24]
WO2016GB52384
Priority number, dateGB2015001374003.08.2015         Original published format: GB 201513740
[2018/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017021728
Date:09.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3331528
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3331528
Date:29.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/451, A61K31/4523, A61P25/14, A61P25/28, A61P25/30, C07D401/14, C07D413/14
[2018/24]
CPC:
A61K31/4523 (EP,US); A61P25/14 (EP,US); A61P25/28 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US); C07D413/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MUSCARINAGONISTEN[2018/24]
English:MUSCARINIC AGONISTS[2018/24]
French:AGONISTES MUSCARINIQUES[2018/24]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2018National basic fee paid 
28.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/24]
28.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2021Fee for grant paid
24.06.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)30.06.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2016
AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CY29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
MC29.09.2021
MK29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
SM29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
[2024/22]
Former [2024/21]HU03.08.2016
AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CY29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
MC29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
SM29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2024/20]HU03.08.2016
AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CY29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
MC29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2024/18]HU03.08.2016
AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
MC29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2023/16]AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
MC29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2023/01]AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SI29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2022/29]AL29.09.2021
AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2022/24]AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RO29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
IS29.01.2022
PT31.01.2022
Former [2022/23]AT29.09.2021
CZ29.09.2021
EE29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
PL29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
SK29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
PT31.01.2022
Former [2022/21]AT29.09.2021
FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
Former [2022/10]FI29.09.2021
HR29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
LV29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
GR30.12.2021
Former [2022/09]FI29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
RS29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
Former [2022/08]FI29.09.2021
LT29.09.2021
BG29.12.2021
NO29.12.2021
Former [2022/07]LT29.09.2021
NO29.12.2021
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007100670  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * pages 23-32; table 1; compounds 1-119 * * examples 1-11 * * pages 66-69 * * claims 1-56 *;
 [A]WO2013072705  (HEPTARES THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * pages 6-14 * * pages 21-24 * * pages 32-34; compounds 1-82 * * pages 67-72; examples A-F * * claims 1-20 *;
 [I]WO2014045031  (HEPTARES THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [I] 1-24 * abstract * * pages 4-14 * * pages 22-26 * * page 34; examples 12, 13 * * pages 69-71; examples A-D * * claims 1-18 *;
 [IP]WO2015118342  (HEPTARES THERAPEUTICS LTD [AE]) [IP] 1-24 * abstract * * pages 5-28 * * pages 36-41 * * pages 48-58; table 1 * * pages 207-214; examples A-D ** claims 1-26 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.