EP3341629 - DEVICE FOR TRIGGERING A GAS SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wandschneider, Guido Ringstrasse 30 74927 Eschelbronn / DE | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16751463.7 | 02.07.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016DE00264 | Priority number, date | DE20151010880 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015010880 | [2018/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017032351 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341629 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341629 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/02 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
F16F9/0245 (EP,US);
F16F9/0263 (US);
F16C1/10 (US);
F16F2230/186 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSLÖSEN EINER GASFEDER | [2018/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRIGGERING A GAS SPRING | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉCLENCHER UN RESSORT À GAZ | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 15.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | LU | 02.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 01.01.2020 | |
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 01.01.2020 | |
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LV | 01.01.2020 | |
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | LV | 01.01.2020 | |
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | LV | 01.01.2020 | |
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | LV | 01.01.2020 | |
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1931012 (BAUER FRITZ) [X] 1-5 * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 26 * * figure 1 * [I] 6-9; | [A]US2008014015 (BRICK RAYMOND P [US]) [A] 6-9 * paragraph [0027] ** figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO2009084915 (SAMHONGSA CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 6-9 * abstract * * figures 5,6,21,22 * | by applicant | DE19716720 | EP0907842 | EP1328738 | DE202013006582U |