Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3259962

EP3259962 - A LOW TEMPERATURE CO-FIRED CERAMIC SUBSTRATE MINIATURE FUEL CELL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Department Of Electronics And Information Technology
MCIT
GOI Electronics Niketan 6
CGO Complex
Lodhi Road
New Delhi 110003 / IN
For all designated states
Director General, Centre For Materials For Electronics Technology
Panchawati
Off Pashan Road
Pune, Maharashtra 411008 / IN
[2017/52]
Inventor(s)01 / DIMBLE, Shekhar
Department of Electrical Engineering
Indian Institute of Technology
Bombay (IITB)
Powai
Mumbai Maharashtra 400076 / IN
02 / KULKARNI, Shrikant
Executive Director
Centre for Materials for Electronics Technology
Panchawati
Off Pashan Road
Pune Maharashtra 411008 / IN
03 / PUSHPANGADAN, Ramesh
Department of Electrical Engineering
Indian Institute of Technology
Bombay (IITB)
Powai
Mumbai Maharashtra 400076 / IN
04 / PATIL, Tarkeshwar
Department of Electrical Engineering
Indian Institute of Technology
Bombay (IITB)
Powai
Mumbai Maharashtra 400076 / IN
05 / PHATAK, Girish
Executive Director
Centre for Materials for Electronics Technology
Panchawati
Off Pashan Road
Pune Maharashtra 411008 / IN
06 / DUTTAGUPTA, Siddhartha
Department of Electrical Engineering
Indian Institute of Technology
Bombay (IITB)
Powai
Mumbai Maharashtra 400076 / IN
 [2017/52]
Representative(s)Chas. Hude A/S
H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1780 Copenhagen V / DK
[2017/52]
Application number, filing date16751990.913.01.2016
[2017/52]
WO2016IB50134
Priority number, dateIN2015DEL49521.02.2015         Original published format: IN 495DE2015
[2017/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016132235
Date:25.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3259962
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IN25.08.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/00, H05K3/00, H01M8/00, H01M8/1039, H01M8/1018, H01M8/0215, H01M8/0228, H01M8/026, H01M8/04007, H01M8/0432, // H05K1/02, H05K3/46
[2018/31]
Former International [2017/52]H05K1/00, H05K3/00, H01M8/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
TitleGerman:MINIATURBRENNSTOFFZELLE MIT LTCC-SUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/52]
English:A LOW TEMPERATURE CO-FIRED CERAMIC SUBSTRATE MINIATURE FUEL CELL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2017/52]
French:PILE À COMBUSTIBLE MINIATURE À SUBSTRAT CÉRAMIQUE COCUIT À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT[2017/52]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2017National basic fee paid 
12.09.2017Search fee paid 
12.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
12.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007275277  (PENG CHUN-WEI [TW], et al) [X] 1-6 * . Claim 10, paragraphs [0020], [0023], [0032], [33], figures 2-5. *