blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3262269

EP3262269 - THREAD PROFILES FOR ROTARY SHOULDERED CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.05.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Deletion: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOV Canada ULC
4300 Bankers Hall West 888
3rd Street S.W.
Calgary AB T2P 05C5 / CA
[2021/29]
Former [2018/01]For all designated states
Dreco Energy Services ULC
2900 Manulife Place 10180 - 101 Street
Edmonton, Alberta T5J 3V5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / KALANTARI, Masoud
2007 - 99 Spruce Place SW
Calgary, Alberta T3C 3X7 / CA
02 / MARCHAND, Nicholas Ryan
1875 Towne Centre Boulevard
Edmonton, Alberta T6R 3J6 / CA
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[2024/07]
Former [2018/01]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date16754683.726.02.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016CA00051
Priority number, dateUS201562121508P27.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562121508 P
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016134451
Date:01.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3262269
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3262269
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA01.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2018
ClassificationIPC:E21B17/042, E21B17/02, F16B33/02
[2018/01]
CPC:
F16B33/02 (EP,US); E21B17/042 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWINDEPROFILE FÜR DREHENDE SCHULTERVERBINDUNGEN[2018/01]
English:THREAD PROFILES FOR ROTARY SHOULDERED CONNECTIONS[2018/01]
French:PROFILÉS DE FILETAGE POUR RACCORDS ROTATIFS À ÉPAULEMENT[2018/01]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2017National basic fee paid 
31.08.2017Search fee paid 
31.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
18.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2024Fee for grant paid
09.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.11.2022Request for further processing filed
15.11.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.11.2022Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
03.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4549754  (SAUNDERS DONNA D [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,13 * column 5, line 20 - line 25 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 25 * * column 8, lines 21-32; figures 9-11,14 * [I] 9,10,12,14,15;
 [X]US4943094  (SIMMONS PAT [US]) [X] 1-5,11,14,15 * column 2, lines 44-59; figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]US6467818  (SNAPP DOUGLAS V [SG], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,13 * column 2, lines 27-30 * * abstract * [I] 12,14,15;
 [A]US2003156918  (BENEDICT DETLEV [DE], et al) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [A]EP1705415  (INTELLISERV INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2006222475  (BREIHAN JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 *
International search[X]US4549754  (SAUNDERS DONNA D [US], et al) [X] 1-13 *Figs. 2, 9, 10, 11 & 14; Col. 5, lines 34-53 and Col. 8, lines 21-32*;
 [A]US7150479  (BENEDICT DETLEV [DE], et al) [A] 1-13*Whole document*;
 [A]US7416374  (BREIHAN JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 *Whole document*
by applicantUS4549754
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.