Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3365597

EP3365597 - LOW-BULK OPTICAL COLLIMATOR FOR GENERATING A SMALL SPOT OF ILLUMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
[2018/35]
Inventor(s)01 / VALTEAU, Cécilia
c/o Maquet SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
02 / VU THI, Minh Hong
c/o Maquet SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
03 / GENEVRIERE, David
c/o Maquet SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
 [2018/35]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2018/35]
Application number, filing date16757697.427.07.2016
[2018/35]
WO2016FR51951
Priority number, dateFR2015006000120.10.2015         Original published format: FR 1560001
[2018/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017068253
Date:27.04.2017
Language:FR
[2017/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3365597
Date:29.08.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2017
[2018/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3365597
Date:03.07.2019
Language:FR
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:F21V5/04, F21V7/00, G02B19/00, F21Y115/10
[2018/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HANDLICHER OPTISCHER KOLLIMATOR ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES KLEINEN BELEUCHTUNGSFLECKS[2018/35]
English:LOW-BULK OPTICAL COLLIMATOR FOR GENERATING A SMALL SPOT OF ILLUMINATION[2018/35]
French:COLLIMATEUR OPTIQUE A ENCOMBREMENT RÉDUIT POUR GÉNÉRER UNE PETITE TACHE D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2018/35]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2018National basic fee paid 
22.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
12.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2019Fee for grant paid
14.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014036510  (PRESTON JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 1,4-6,9,11,13,15 * [I] 14;
 [XI]US2009128921  (ROTH ERIC A [US]) [X] 1-3,6-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * figure 1 * [I] 14;
 [XI]US2014204587  (HUKKANEN HANNU [FI]) [X] 1,2,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-8 * [I] 10,14;
 [XI]CN102537843  (SHANGHAI TECH PHYSICS INST, et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * page 1 - page 5 * * figures 1-8 * [I] 6,11,14;
 [XP]WO2016057580  (ZHAO FENG [US]) [XP] 1-3,7,8,10-13 * page 8, line 12 - page 18, line 23 * * figures 1-17 *