blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3496683

EP3496683 - SURGICAL APPARATUS FOR SLICING LAMELLAR SEGMENTS FROM BIOLOGICAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/25]SURGICAL APPARATUS AND BLADE ELEMENTS FOR SLICING LAMELLAR SEGMENTS FROM BIOLOGICAL TISSUE
[2021/03]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.10.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.11.2021  [2021/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gebauer-Klopotek Patent Verwaltungs-UG (haftungsbeschränkt)
Monbachstrasse 7/1
75242 Neuhausen / DE
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / KLOPOTEK, Peter, J.
Monbachstrasse 7/1
75242 Neuhausen / DE
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Wachinger, Julian Friedrich
rwzh Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Barthstrasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date16757974.709.08.2016
[2019/25]
WO2016IB54793
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018029509
Date:15.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3496683
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61F9/013, A61B17/3211
[2019/25]
CPC:
A61F9/0133 (EP,US); A61B2017/306 (EP,US); A61B2017/320052 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON LAMELLENSEGMENTEN AUS BIOLOGISCHEM GEWEBE[2021/03]
English:SURGICAL APPARATUS FOR SLICING LAMELLAR SEGMENTS FROM BIOLOGICAL TISSUE[2021/03]
French:APPAREIL CHIRURGICAL POUR COUPER DES SEGMENTS LAMELLAIRES D'UN TISSU.[2019/25]
Former [2019/25]CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND KLINGENELEMENTE ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON LAMELLENSEGMENTEN AUS BIOLOGISCHEM GEWEBE
Former [2019/25]SURGICAL APPARATUS AND BLADE ELEMENTS FOR SLICING LAMELLAR SEGMENTS FROM BIOLOGICAL TISSUE
Entry into regional phase06.03.2019National basic fee paid 
06.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
06.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/45]
25.06.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2021/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.202106   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2001053917  (LIN CHWEN-YIH [TW], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [ 0026] - [0035]; figures 2-8; claims 1-10 * [I] 2-5,8-14;
 [A]US6296650  (CARRIAZO CESAR C [CO]) [A] 1-5,8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] - [0108] - [ 0121] - [0137]; figures 1-10, 14-25, 30-32 *;
 [A]EP1752119  (WAVELIGHT LASER TECHNOLOGIE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,8-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2008136004  (D O T DAN OPHTHALMIC TECHNOLOG [IL], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * abstract * * page 15, line 17 - page 16, line 5; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO2007121073  (COOPERVISION INT HOLDING CO LP [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0040]; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5342378  (GIRAUD CLARENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - line 20; figure 5 *;
 [A]US4662370  (HOFFMANN FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,8-14 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 20; figure 1 *
by applicantUS2007265650
 US6030398
 US6099541
 US6626924
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.