Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3265569

EP3265569 - GENERATION OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stora Enso Oyj
P.O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
[2018/02]
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, Simon
15 Fog Lane
Didsbury Manchester M20 6AY / GB
02 / MISHRA, Laxmi
6 Brocade Close
Salford M36AG / GB
03 / KUMAR, Manoj
10 Bryndale Grove
Sale Cheshire M33 4EQ / GB
04 / ETCHELLS, Peter
1125 Harvard Drive
Davis, California 95616 / US
 [2018/02]
Representative(s)Forsberg, Anna Karin
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
65009 Karlstad / SE
[2018/02]
Application number, filing date16758528.001.03.2016
[2018/02]
WO2016IB51131
Priority number, dateUS201562126965P02.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562126965 P
[2018/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016139579
Date:09.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3265569
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE09.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82
[2018/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/02]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON BIOMASSE[2018/02]
English:GENERATION OF BIOMASS[2018/02]
French:PRODUCTION DE BIOMASSE[2018/02]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2017National basic fee paid 
02.10.2017Search fee paid 
02.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/02]
05.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]  - ZHANG JING ET AL, "The formation of wood and its control", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, (20131130), vol. 17, doi:10.1016/J.PBI.2013.11.003, ISSN 1369-5266, pages 56 - 63, XP028608365 [A] 1-32 * page 58, column l, paragraph 2 - page 58, column r, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pbi.2013.11.003
 [AP]  - J. PETER ETCHELLS ET AL, "A brief history of the TDIF-PXY signalling module: balancing meristem identity and differentiation during vascular development", NEW PHYTOLOGIST, GB, (20160101), vol. 209, no. 2, doi:10.1111/nph.13642, ISSN 0028-646X, pages 474 - 484, XP055488398 [AP] 1-32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/nph.13642
 [AP]  - WANG RUI ET AL, "Vascular expression ofPopulus LRR-RLKgenes and the effects of their overexpression on wood formation", MOLECULAR BREEDING: NEW STRATEGIES IN PLANT IMPROVEMENT, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, vol. 35, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S11032-015-0386-2, ISSN 1380-3743, (20151116), pages 1 - 12, (20151116), XP035923997 [AP] 1-32 * page 6, column l, paragraph 2 - page 11, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11032-015-0386-2
International search[XY]WO2010029357  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11-16, 22-25, 30-31, 33-41 * ); page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 10; page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 8; page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 32; page 6, line 12 - page 6, line 14; page 10, line 19 - page 10, line 26; page 11, line 14 - page 11, line 19; page 12, line 8 - page 12, line 14; page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 2; page 12, line * [Y] 5, 10, 17-21, 26- 29, 32, 42-44;
 [Y]US2003159180  (FISCHER ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 5, 17-21, 26, 28- 29, 32, 42-44 * ); paragraphs [0010], [0012], [0130]-[0131] *;
 [Y]US5495007  (THOMPSON GARY A [US], et al) [Y] 10 * ); column 4, line 18 - column 4, line 29 *;
 [X]WO2010029357  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2003159180  (FISCHER ROBERT L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5495007  (THOMPSON GARY A [US], et al);
 [X]  - Registry, (20160616), Database accession no. 2010:333205
 [XY]  - ETCHELLS J. P . et al., "The PXY-CLE41 receptor ligand pair defines a multifunctional pathway that controls the rate and orientation of vascular cell division", Development, (20100000), vol. 137, pages 767 - 774, XP055478463 [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11-16, 22-25, 27, 33-41 * ; whole document; abstract; page 770, column 2, paragraph [0002]; page 771, column 1, paragraph [0002]; figure 7 * [Y] 5, 10, 17-21, 26, 32, 42-44

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.044941
 [XY]  - QIANG Y. et al., "CLE peptides in vascular development", Journal of integrative plant biology, (20130000), vol. 55, pages 389 - 394, XP055478473 [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11-16, 33 * ; whole document; abstract; page 391, column 1, paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * [Y] 5, 10, 17-21, 26

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jipb.12044
 [XY]  - HIRAKAWA, Y et al., "Non cell -autonomous control of vascular stem cell fate by a CLE peptide/receptor system", PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.0808444105, pages 15208 - 15213, XP 002569086 [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11-16, 33 * ; abstract; page 15208, column 2, paragraph [0001]; page 15211, column 2, paragraph [0001] - page 15211, column 2, paragraph [0002] * [Y] 5, 10, 17-21, 26
 [XY]  - RISOPATRON J.P .M. et al., "The vascular cambium: molecular control of cellular structure", Protoplasma, (20100000), vol. 247, doi:doi:10.1007/s00709-010-0211-z, pages 145 - 161, XP 019864059 [X] 1-4, 6-9, 11-16, 33 * ; whole document; abstract; page 156, column 1, paragraph [0001] - page 157, column 1, paragraph [0001] * [Y] 5, 10, 17-21, 26
 [PXY]  - ETCHELLS J.P . et al., "Wood formation in trees is increased by manipulating PXY-regulated cell division", Current Biology, (20150000), vol. 25, pages 1050 - 1055, XP055478528 [P,X] 1-27, 32-44 * ; whole document; abstract * [Y] 28-31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2015.02.023
 [PXY]  - WANG R. et al., "Vascular expression of Populus LRR-RLK genes and the effects of their overexpression on wood formation", Mol Breeding, (20150000), vol. 35, pages 1 - 12, XP035923997 [P,X] 1-27, 32-44 * ; abstract; page 220, column 1 - page 220, column 2 * [Y] 28-31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11032-015-0386-2
    [] - REGISTRY, (20160616), Database accession no. 2010:333205
 [X]  - ETCHELLS J. P . ET AL., "The PXY-CLE41 receptor ligand pair defines a multifunctional pathway that controls the rate and orientation of vascular cell division", DEVELOPMENT, (2010), vol. 137, pages 767 - 774, XP055478463

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.044941
 [X]  - QIANG Y. ET AL., "CLE peptides in vascular development", JOURNAL OF INTEGRATIVE PLANT BIOLOGY, (2013), vol. 55, pages 389 - 394, XP055478473

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jipb.12044
 [X]  - HIRAKAWA, Y ET AL., "Non cell -autonomous control of vascular stem cell fate by a CLE peptide/receptor system", PNAS, (2008), vol. 105, pages 15208 - 15213, XP002569086

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0808444105
 [X]  - RISOPATRON J.P .M. ET AL., "The vascular cambium: molecular control of cellular structure", PROTOPLASMA, (2010), vol. 247, pages 145 - 161, XP019864059

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00709-010-0211-z
 [XP]  - ETCHELLS J.P . ET AL., "Wood formation in trees is increased by manipulating PXY-regulated cell division", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2015), vol. 25, pages 1050 - 1055, XP055478528

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2015.02.023
 [XP]  - WANG R. ET AL., "Vascular expression of Populus LRR-RLK genes and the effects of their overexpression on wood formation", MOL BREEDING, (2015), vol. 35, pages 1 - 12, XP035923997

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11032-015-0386-2