Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3270005

EP3270005 - TOROIDAL CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION, AND DRIVE-MECHANISM-INTEGRATED POWER GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Kenichiro
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
02 / IMAI, Hideyuki
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
03 / ABE, Akihito
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16761304.108.03.2016
[2018/03]
WO2016JP01256
Priority number, dateJP2015004632909.03.2015         Original published format: JP 2015046329
[2018/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016143330
Date:15.09.2016
Language:JA
[2016/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3270005
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:F16H15/38, B64D41/00, F16H57/04, H02K7/10
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
TitleGerman:STUFENLOSES TOROIDGETRIEBE UND ANTRIEBSMECHANISMUSINTEGRIERTE STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/03]
English:TOROIDAL CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION, AND DRIVE-MECHANISM-INTEGRATED POWER GENERATION DEVICE[2018/03]
French:TRANSMISSION TOROÏDALE À VARIATION CONTINUE ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE INTÉGRÉ DE MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT[2018/03]
Entry into regional phase19.09.2017Translation filed 
19.09.2017National basic fee paid 
19.09.2017Search fee paid 
19.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
19.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2001330100  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,3-8 * figure 6 * [Y] 2,9;
 [X]JP2009275745  (NSK LTD) [X] 1,4-7 * figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]JP2003065408  (NSK LTD) [Y] 2 * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]JP2010179815  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *
International search[XYA]JP2002106667  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0031]; fig. 7 & US 2002/0039948 A1 paragraphs [0027] to [0042]; fig. 7 * [Y] 5-6, 8 [A] 7;
 [XYA]JP2003065408  (NSK LTD) [X] 1-2 * , fig. 2, 4 & US 2003/0060324 A1 fig. 2, 4 & DE 10239232 A1 * [Y] 3-6, 8 [A] 7;
 [Y]JP2003202062  (NSK LTD) [Y] 3-6, 8 * , fig. 1 to 3 & US 2003/0060324 A1 fig. 8 to 10B & DE 10239232 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2007523310  (DaimlerChrysler AG) [Y] 5-6, 8 * , paragraphs [0054] to [0055]; fig. 3 & US 2007/0015623 A1 paragraphs [0057] to [0058]; fig. 3 & WO 2005/080825 A1 & DE 102004009409 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2010179815  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0040]; fig. 5 & US 2010/0200692 A1 paragraphs [0028] to [0050]; fig. 5 & EP 2216530 A2 & CA 2692065 A1 *