Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3341719

EP3341719 - PROBE ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM INCLUDING A MODULAR DEVICE AND A CABLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Creganna Unlimited Company
Parkmore West
Ballybrit, Galway / IE
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / PETERSON, Ryan
c/o Tyco Electronics Corporation
10025 SW Freeman Court
Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US
02 / MEDINA, Thomas, J.
17566 NW Lonerock Drive
Portland, OR 97229 / US
03 / WANG, Jian
34298 Mimosa Terrace
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
04 / SUN, Jibin
564 Shoal Circle
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/27]
Application number, filing date16762940.126.08.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016US49068
Priority number, dateUS20151483784227.08.2015         Original published format: US201514837842
[2018/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017035496
Date:02.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3341719
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017
[2018/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3341719
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/24, A61B8/00, B06B1/02, H01R4/00
[2018/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SONDE UND SYSTEM MIT EINEM MODULAREN GERÄT UND EINER KABELANORDNUNG[2019/14]
English:PROBE ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM INCLUDING A MODULAR DEVICE AND A CABLE ASSEMBLY[2018/27]
French:ASSEMBLAGE DE SONDE ET SYSTÈME CONTENANT UN DISPOSITIF MODULAIRE ET UNE ASSEMBLAGE DE CÂBLE[2019/14]
Former [2018/27]PROBENANORDNUNG UND SYSTEM MIT EINER MODULAREN VORRICHTUNG UND KABELANORDNUNG
Former [2018/27]ENSEMBLE SONDE ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF MODULAIRE ET UN ENSEMBLE CÂBLE
Entry into regional phase20.03.2018National basic fee paid 
20.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
20.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.07.2019Fee for grant paid
29.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5957850  (MARIAN JR VAUGHN R [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-10,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 65 * [A] 3-5;
 [Y]WO2010047678  (BLACKTOE MEDICAL III INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0057] *;
 [Y]US6645145  (DRESCHEL WILLIAM R [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,11 * abstract * * column 6, line 44 - column 14, line 20 *;
 [Y]US2009124136  (PEPE PAUL JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] *