Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3341958

EP3341958 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING TO A SUBSTRATE A LIQUID MEDIUM THAT HAS BEEN CHARGED WITH UV RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Süss Microtec Photomask Equipment GmbH & Co. KG
Ferdinand-von-Steinbeis-Ring 10
75447 Sternenfels / DE
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / DRESS, Peter
c/o SÜSS MicroTec Photomask Equipment GmbH&Co.KG
Ferdinand-von-Steinbeis-Ring 10
75447 Sternenfels / DE
02 / DIETZE, Uwe
c/o SÜSS MicroTec Photomask Equipment GmbH&Co.KG
Ferdinand-von-Steinbeis-Ring 10
75447 Sternenfels / DE
03 / GRABITZ, Peter
c/o SÜSS MicroTec Photomask Equipment GmbH&Co.KG
Ferdinand-von-Steinbeis-Ring 10
75447 Sternenfels / DE
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date16762983.124.08.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016EP69989
Priority number, dateDE2015101122927.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015011229
[2018/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017032806
Date:02.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3341958
Date:04.07.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/67, B08B3/10, B08B7/00, C23C16/455
[2018/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES MIT UV-STRAHLUNG BEAUFSCHLAGTEN FLÜSSIGEN MEDIUMS AUF EIN SUBSTRAT[2018/27]
English:DEVICE FOR APPLYING TO A SUBSTRATE A LIQUID MEDIUM THAT HAS BEEN CHARGED WITH UV RADIATION[2018/27]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UN MILIEU LIQUIDE EXPOSÉ À UN RAYONNEMENT UV SUR UN SUBSTRAT[2018/27]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2018National basic fee paid 
27.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
27.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP2496367  (HAMATECH APE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0028] , [0061] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * [Y] 7-9;
 [I]JP2003159571  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC) [I] 1-6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3,4(c) * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; figures 5(a)-5(c) *;
 [I]EP1348483  (SHINETSU ENG CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0096] , [0098] - [0105]; figure 4 * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0122] , [0123]; figure 8 *;
 [Y]US2012132618  (BALUJA SANJEEV [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0035]; figures 7A-7C *;
 [A]US2013320235  (LIEN MING HUEI [TW], et al) [A] 2-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0073] , [0076] , [0077]; figures 9,10,12,13 *;
 [A]JP2008101947  (GS YUASA CORP) [A] 4-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US2012223631  (YOSHIHARA KEITA [JP], et al) [A] 2-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0022]; figure 5 *
by applicantDE102009058962