Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3272555

EP3272555 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAGUCHI, Masashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/28]
Former [2018/04]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16764672.826.02.2016
[2018/04]
WO2016JP55956
Priority number, dateJP2015005470018.03.2015         Original published format: JP 2015054700
[2018/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016147842
Date:22.09.2016
Language:JA
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3272555
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3272555
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/03, B60C11/13
[2018/09]
Former International [2018/04]B60C11/13, B60C11/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2018/04]
English:TIRE[2018/04]
French:PNEU[2018/04]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2017Translation filed 
15.08.2017National basic fee paid 
15.08.2017Search fee paid 
15.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
15.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2019Fee for grant paid
29.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2007106314  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-4,6 * figure 6 *;
 [X]EP0561531  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2012291934  (IWABUCHI SOTARO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *;
 [X]JP2000108615  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]EP0485883  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 1-3 *
International search[XY]CN102887039  (XIAMEN CHENG SHIN RUBBER IND) [X] 1-3, 5, 7 * , claims; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 6;
 [Y]WO2011145721  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0045] to [0047]; fig. 6 & EP 2574478 A1 columns [0045] to [0047]; fig. 6 & JP 5856051 B & US 2013/0118664 A1 & AU 2011255847 A & CN 102905912 A *;
 [Y]JP2013233834  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 6 * , paragraph [0003] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005067267  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015040023  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & WO 2015/025790 A1 *;
 [A]JP2010000883  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2014142349  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 2014-184736 A & US 2016/0023518 A & EP 2974888 A1 & CN 105008148 A *;
 [A]WO2014099491  (BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE [US]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 2016-501777 A & US 2015/0328932 A1 & EP 2934915 A & CN 104870218 A *;
 [PA]WO2016009912  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 2016-20169 A *