Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3272549

EP3272549 - NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE Akihiko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/04]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16765124.918.03.2016
[2018/04]
WO2016JP58821
Priority number, dateJP2015005424718.03.2015         Original published format: JP 2015054247
[2018/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016148295
Date:22.09.2016
Language:JA
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3272549
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60B9/04, B60C7/00, B60B1/02, B60B5/02, B60B9/26, B60C7/10
[2018/18]
Former International [2018/04]B60B9/04, B60C7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
TitleGerman:LUFTLOSER REIFEN[2018/04]
English:NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE[2018/04]
French:PNEU NON-PNEUMATIQUE[2018/04]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2017Translation filed 
21.09.2017National basic fee paid 
21.09.2017Search fee paid 
21.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
21.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2010132259  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 60]; figure 12 * [I] 2,3;
 [A]EP1420964  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0052] , [0 53]; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]US2011272254  (ANDERFAAS ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050]; figures 1-3 *
International search[A]JP2014125081  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2015/0258853 A1 & WO 2014/103723 A1 & EP 2889158 A1 & CN 104755278 A *;
 [A]JP2014125080  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2015/0273945 A1 & WO 2014/103701 A1 & EP 2939851 A1 & CN 104781091 A *;
 [A]JP2014125079  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2015/0246577 A1 & WO 2014/103419 A1 & EP 2886368 A1 & CN 104736354 A *;
 [A]JP2014091453  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-3 * , entire text & US 2015/0273946 A1 & WO 2014/069653 A1 & EP 2902217 A1 & CN 104781089 A *;
 [A]JP2014008952  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014008791  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013071652  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Familv: none) *;
 [PA]WO2015194088  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [PA]WO2015194087  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *