Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3256337

EP3256337 - ROOFTOP-MOUNTED AIR-CONDITIONING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
04.01.2019Change - extension statespublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBM-Papst Mulfingen GmbH&CO. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2017/51]
Inventor(s)01 / RATHGEB, Josef
Beethovenstrasse 21
73489 Jagstzell / DE
02 / HAAF, Oliver
Georg Adam Reinhardstrasse 12
74635 Kupferzell / DE
 [2017/51]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/51]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16767286.420.09.2016
[2017/51]
WO2016EP72269
Priority number, dateDE20151011855730.10.2015         Original published format: DE102015118557
[2017/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017071880
Date:04.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3256337
Date:20.12.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017
[2017/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00
[2017/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
TitleGerman:AUFDACHKLIMAANLAGE[2017/51]
English:ROOFTOP-MOUNTED AIR-CONDITIONING INSTALLATION[2017/51]
French:ÉQUIPEMENT DE CLIMATISATION DE TOIT[2017/51]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2017National basic fee paid 
14.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
14.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]JPS5114908U  (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-4,7-12 * figures 4-6 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 5,6;
 [XYI]US4641502  (ALDRICH ROGER L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12,13 * column 2, line 66 - column 11, line 8; figure - * [Y] 14,15 [I] 6,7;
 [XYI]US6134909  (LYU JEONG-UN [KR]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 2, line 62 - column 5, line 25; figure - * [Y] 14,15 [I] 5,6;
 [XYI]JPS60199717  (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * [Y] 14,15 [I] 5,6;
 [XP]CN205344430U  (EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO KG) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XP]DE202015105776U  (EBM PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Unknown Unknown, "Radialventilatoren und -gebläse Die Wahl der Ingenieure", (20071023), URL: http://www.ebmpapst.com/media/content/info-center/downloads_10/catalogs/centrifugal_fans_1/Radialventilatoren_2007_DE.pdf, (20170116), XP055335711 [Y] 14,15 * page 13 - page 516; figure - *
by applicantDE102007023249
 DE602004006988T
 EP1667862