EP3271603 - DISC BRAKE PAD RETENTION SYSTEM AND MOUNTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, OH 44035 / US | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Avenue Elyria, OH 44035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Harish c/o Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | 02 /
LANTZ, Richard L. c/o Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | 03 /
DENG, Kailin c/o Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16769383.7 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016US23002 | Priority number, date | US201514664067 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US201514664067 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153945 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271603 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/097, F16D65/04, F16D65/092, F16D65/095 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
F16D65/0977 (EP,US);
F16D55/225 (EP,US);
F16D65/0006 (EP,US);
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D65/0978 (EP,US);
F16D69/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | RÜCKHALTESYSTEM FÜR SCHEIBENBREMSBELAG UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN | [2018/04] | English: | DISC BRAKE PAD RETENTION SYSTEM AND MOUNTING METHOD | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MAINTIEN DE PLAQUETTE DE FREIN À DISQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 12.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/50] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 20.11.2017 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4560038 (GERARD JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 4 * [Y] 5-12,14-21; | [X]DE19953159 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [X] 1,13* column 8, line 29 - line 43; figure 4 *; | [XA]GB2356027 (FEDERAL MOGUL BRAKE SYST LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,13 * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 33; figure 1 * [A] 5-12,14-21; | [X]US2006054425 (MAEHARA TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4,13 * paragraph [0172]; figure 16 *; | [Y]DE102013011655 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-12,14-21 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3768605 (CARRE J) [Y] 6, 15-21 * entlre document *; | [Y]US2004026188 (EMMETT ROBERT A [DE], et al) [Y] 8, 10, 17, 19 * entire document *; | [A]US2009283372 (MATSUSHIMA TORU [JP]) [A] 1-21* entire document *; | [XY]US2014345983 (BAUMGARTNER JOHANN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 9, 11-14 * entire document * [Y] 6, 8, 10, 15-21 | by applicant | US4560038 | DE4032886 | US8540061 | DE102013011655 |