Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3274820

EP3274820 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING COPIED COMPUTER CODE USING FINGERPRINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terbium Labs, Inc.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
[2018/05]
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, Daniel J.
c/o TERBIUM LABS, INC.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
02 / MOORE, Michael
c/o TERBIUM LABS, INC.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
03 / BLAZAKIS, Dionysus
c/o TERBIUM LABS, INC.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
 [2018/05]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/05]
Application number, filing date16769662.424.03.2016
[2018/05]
WO2016US23940
Priority number, dateUS201562138543P26.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562138543 P
[2018/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016154396
Date:29.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3274820
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F21/16, G06F8/75, G06F21/44
[2018/44]
Former International [2018/05]G06F9/44, G06F9/45, G06F21/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/05]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES KOPIERTEN COMPUTERCODES MIT FINGERABDRÜCKEN[2018/05]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING COPIED COMPUTER CODE USING FINGERPRINTS[2018/05]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER UN CODE INFORMATIQUE COPIÉ, À L'AIDE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES[2018/05]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2017National basic fee paid 
19.10.2017Search fee paid 
19.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/05]
19.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2014223565  (COHEN JONATHAN D [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0095] * * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US5752241  (COHEN EDITH [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-3, 7 * * columns 1-4 * * columns 6-10 * * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US2013036129  (HAVEL IVAN [CZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0069] * * claims 1-11 *
 [Y]  - CHRISTIAN S COLLBERG ET AL, "Dynamic graph-based software fingerprinting", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON PROGRAMMING LANGUAGE AND SYSTEMS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, (20071001), vol. 29, no. 6, doi:10.1145/1286821.1286826, ISSN 0164-0925, pages 35 - es, XP058302116 [Y] 1-15 * figures 3, 6 * * pages 2-5 * * pages 15-22 * * pages 27-36 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1286821.1286826
International search[XY]US2014223565  (COHEN JONATHAN D [US]) [X] 1, 5, 8, 9 * entire document * [Y] 2-4, 6, 7, 10-14;
 [Y]US2014090067  (TRIPP OMER [IL]) [Y] 2, 10 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2013166600  (SNYDER II JAMES DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4, 6, 7, 11-14 * entire document *;
 [Y]US6381739  (BRETERNITZ JR MAURICIO [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012254830  (CONRAD MIRKO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012317421  (GOUNARES ALEXANDER G [US]) [A] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013036129  (HAVEL IVAN [CZ], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [PX]US8997256  (ROGERS DANIEL JORDAN [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011246968  (ZHANG DONGMEI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *
 [X]US2014223565  (COHEN JONATHAN D [US]);
 [Y]US2014090067  (TRIPP OMER [IL]);
 [Y]US2013166600  (SNYDER II JAMES DANIEL [US], et al);
 [Y]US6381739  (BRETERNITZ JR MAURICIO [US], et al);
 [A]US2012254830  (CONRAD MIRKO [US], et al);
 [A]US2012317421  (GOUNARES ALEXANDER G [US]);
 [A]US2013036129  (HAVEL IVAN [CZ], et al);
 [XP]US8997256  (ROGERS DANIEL JORDAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2011246968  (ZHANG DONGMEI [US], et al)