Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3341277

EP3341277 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2019Interruptionpublished on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bloks. AG
c/o Concordanz Anstalt
Feldkircherstrasse 15
9494 Schaan / LI
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / MEERMANN, Daniel
c/o Bloks. GmbH
Agnes-Pockels-Bogen 1
80992 München / DE
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Kilian Kilian & Partner
Aidenbachstraße 54
81379 München / DE
Application number, filing date16769873.726.08.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016EP70227
Priority number, dateDE20151021634626.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015216346
[2018/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017032890
Date:02.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3341277
Date:04.07.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B62M6/45, B62M6/00, B62M9/122, B62M9/132
[2018/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
TitleGerman:STEUERGERÄT FÜR EIN FAHRRAD[2018/27]
English:CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BICYCLE[2018/27]
French:APPAREIL DE COMMANDE POUR BICYCLETTE[2018/27]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2018National basic fee paid 
26.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
26.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Stay/Interruption07.12.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2019/11]
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2015232065  (RICCI CHRISTOPHER P [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,10,13-17 * paragraphs [007 ] - [0 33] - [ 612 ] - [ 327]; figures 23-25 * [I] 9,11,12
 [XA]US2013167159  (RICCI CHRISTOPHER P [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-17
 [A]CN201863985U  (WUHAN ROBOTELL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * Beschreibung das Fig. 4;; figure 4 *
 [A]WO2014047341  (CIVILIZED CYCLES INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0077]; figures 1A-5 *
 [A]EP2549380  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-28 *