Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3344404

EP3344404 - METHOD FOR BIOLOGICALLY REDUCING THE QUANTITY OF MAGNESIUM, OR THE QUANTITY OF MAGNESIUM AND IRON, IN AN ASBESTOS WASTE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmater
4 Avenue Feuchères
30000 Nimes / FR
[2018/28]
Inventor(s)01 / GEOFFROY, Valérie
5 Rue de la Montée
67350 Grassendorf / FR
02 / REGIS, Robert
7 Rue Auguste Comte
34000 Montpellier / FR
 [2018/28]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/28]
Application number, filing date16770066.531.08.2016
[2018/28]
WO2016FR52154
Priority number, dateFR2015005808031.08.2015         Original published format: FR 1558080
[2018/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017037383
Date:09.03.2017
Language:FR
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3344404
Date:11.07.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B09C1/10, C12R1/38
[2018/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN REDUKTION DER MENGE AN MAGNESIUM ODER DER MENGE AN MAGNESIUM UND EISEN IN EINEM ASBESTABFALLPRODUKT[2018/28]
English:METHOD FOR BIOLOGICALLY REDUCING THE QUANTITY OF MAGNESIUM, OR THE QUANTITY OF MAGNESIUM AND IRON, IN AN ASBESTOS WASTE PRODUCT[2018/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION PAR VOIE BIOLOGIQUE DE LA QUANTITÉ DE MAGNÉSIUM, OU DE LA QUANTITÉ DE MAGNÉSIUM ET DE FER D'UN DÉCHET D'AMIANTE[2018/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2018National basic fee paid 
27.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/28]
31.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2428254  (CHEMICAL CT S R L [IT]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [X]  - STANIK INGA ADAMINA ET AL, "Destruction of the chrysotile asbestos structure with a population of the bacteria Lactobacillus casei and Lactobacillus plantarum", FRESENIUS ENVIRONMENTAL BULLETIN, FREISING-WEIHENSTEPHAN, DE, (20060101), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1018-4619, pages 640 - 643, XP008134671 [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BHATTACHARYA SHABORI ET AL, "Bacterial Weathering of Asbestos", SILICON, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S12633-014-9260-9, ISSN 1876-990X, (20150422), pages 419 - 431, (20150422), XP035532299 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12633-014-9260-9
 [A]  - Stephen B Philsons ET AL, "T H E JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY Siderochromes from Pseudomonas fluorescens I. ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION*", (19820725), pages 8081 - 8085, URL: http://www.jbc.org/content/257/14/8081.full.pdf#page=1&view=FitH, XP055282516 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - C D Cox ET AL, "Siderophore activity of pyoverdin for Pseudomonas aeruginosa", Infection and Immunity, UNITED STATES, (198504), pages 130 - 138, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC261925/pdf/iai00115-0138.pdf, XP055282138 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - S Daghino ET AL, "Fungal weathering and implications in the solubilization of metals from soil and from asbestos fibres", Current Research, Technology and Education Topics in Applied Microbiology and Microbial Biotechnology, (2010), pages 329 - 338, URL: http://www.formatex.info/microbiology2/329-338.pdf, (20160621), XP055282358 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FAVERO-LONGO ET AL, "Interactions of sterile-cultured lichen-forming ascomycetes with asbestos fibres", MYCOLOGICAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, GB, (200704), vol. 111, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.MYCRES.2007.01.013, ISSN 0953-7562, pages 473 - 481, XP022100599 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mycres.2007.01.013
 [A]  - VANESSA CHARDOT-JACQUES ET AL, "Chrysotile Dissolution in the Rhizosphere of the Nickel Hyperaccumulator Leptoplax emarginata", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, US, (20130319), vol. 47, no. 6, doi:10.1021/es301229m, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 2612 - 2620, XP055282246 [A] 1-10 * page 2616; tables 1,5a * * page 2618 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es301229m
 [A]  - MANI RAJKUMAR ET AL, "Biotechnological applications of serpentine soil bacteria for phytoremediation of trace metals", CRC CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20090508), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1080/07388550902913772, ISSN 0738-8551, pages 120 - 130, XP055313790 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07388550902913772