Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3280202

EP3280202 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION SIGNAL THROUGH UNLICENSED BAND IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2018/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Hanbyul
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19
Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2018/06]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/06]
Application number, filing date16773458.131.03.2016
[2018/06]
WO2016KR03314
Priority number, dateUS201562142489P03.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562142489 P
[2018/06]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016159677
Date:06.10.2016
Language:KO
[2016/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3280202
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.10.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/02, H04W72/04, H04W88/02
[2018/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSSIGNALS VON VORRICHTUNG ZU VORRICHTUNG DURCH EIN UNLIZENZIERTES BAND IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2018/06]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION SIGNAL THROUGH UNLICENSED BAND IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2018/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION D'UN SIGNAL DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF VIA UNE BANDE SANS LICENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT[2018/06]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2017Translation filed 
26.09.2017National basic fee paid 
26.09.2017Search fee paid 
26.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
26.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2015021185  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 US2016183276  [ ] (MARINIER PAUL [CA], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 81] , [0 93] - [0094] - [ 102] - [0103] - [ 107] , [ 112] - [0117] - [ 164] , [ 185] - [0186] * * paragraphs [0193] , [ 201] , [ 204] , [ 214] , [ 216] , [ 286] , [ 289] , [ 291] * * paragraphs [0298] - [0299] - [ 302] , [ 307] - [0309] - [ 316] * * figures 2, 3 *;
 [Y]US2015016312  (LI YING [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0086] , [0 87] , [ 120] , [ 139] * * claim 9 * * figure 10B *;
 [A]US2014328329  (NOVLAN THOMAS DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0152] , [ 156] , [ 218] , [ 238] , [ 279] , [ 284] , [ 304] - [0305] - [ 314] *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on Resource Allocation in D2D Communications", vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20131111 - 20131115, (20131113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-135481 RESOURCE ALLOCATION IN D2D COMMUNICATIONS_LG, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20131113), XP050735154 [A] 1-12 * chapter 3 *
International search[A]US2014307642  (WÄNSTEDT STEFAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0073]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2014094183  (GAO CHUNYAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0043] - [0075]; and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2015043483  (SARTORI PHILIPPE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0047]; and figure 6. *;
 [A]  - CATT, "Design of Frame-based LBT for LAA", R1 - 151003, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Ad-hoc Meeting, Paris, France, (20150318), XP050951381 [A] 1-12 * See section 2.3, 2.4. *
 [A]  - ZTE, "Discussion on the Evaluation Methodology for UL Transmission in Unlicensed Spectrum", R1 - 150150, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #80, Athens, Greece, (20150218), XP050948869 [A] 1-12 * See page 2. *