Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3274040

EP3274040 - FLUID-EXPANDABLE BODY ARTICULATION OF CATHETERS AND OTHER FLEXIBLE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Project Moray, Inc.
3603 Hillcrest Drive
Belmont, California 94002 / US
[2018/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURANG, Henry
1227 Bourang Way
Turlock, California 95382 / US
02 / LABY, Keith Philip
12 Ascot Lane
Oakland, California 94611 / US
03 / BARRISH, Mark D.
3603 Hillcrest Drive
Belmont, California 94002 / US
 [2018/05]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/05]
Application number, filing date16773852.525.03.2016
[2018/05]
WO2016US24280
Priority number, dateUS201562139430P27.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562139430 P
US201562175095P12.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562175095 P
US201562248573P30.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562248573 P
US201562263231P04.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562263231 P
US201662296409P17.02.2016         Original published format: US 201662296409 P
[2018/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016160589
Date:06.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3274040
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.10.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/01
[2018/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/05]
TitleGerman:FLUIDEXPANDIERBARES KÖRPERGELENK VON KATHETERN UND ANDEREN FLEXIBLEN STRUKTUREN[2018/05]
English:FLUID-EXPANDABLE BODY ARTICULATION OF CATHETERS AND OTHER FLEXIBLE STRUCTURES[2018/05]
French:ARTICULATION DE CORPS DÉPLOYABLE PAR FLUIDE POUR CATHÉTERS ET AUTRES STRUCTURES FLEXIBLES[2018/05]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2017National basic fee paid 
09.10.2017Search fee paid 
09.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/05]
09.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201803   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2014046250  (JAIN AJAY KUMAR [GB] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,10-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042] - [0052] - [0055] - [0062]; figures 1-2,7,13 * [Y] 1-9,12;
 [X]US2007100235  (KENNEDY KENNETH C II [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0065] , [0068] , [0069] , [0071] , [0073]; figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2005187467  (KLEEN MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 1-9,12 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]US4838859  (STRASSMANN STEVE [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,6,7,9,12 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 34; figures 2A-2D *;
 [A]US4983165  (LOITERMAN DAVID A [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4875897  (LEE GARRETT [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 5-6 *;
 [A]US2006074372  (HAGA YOICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 4a-4c,6a-6b *
International search[A]US2007100235  (Kennedy, II) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document, especially fig 1, 6-7; para [0046], [0084]-[0085], [0104] *;
 [A]US4983165  (Loiterman) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document, especially fig 1-6; col 3, ln 48-56; col 4, In 7-34 *;
 [A]US2014142666  (Phelan et al.) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document, especially fig 4b, 4g; para [0041] *;
 [A]US2013296983  (Keller et al.) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document, especially fig 1-4; para [0099]-[0100], [0103] *;
 [A]US4838859  (Strassmann) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2002049408  (Van Moorlegem et al.) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document *;
 [A]US4762130  (Fogarty et al.) [A] 1-14, 23-25 * , entire document *
by applicantUS2014046250
 US2007100235