Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3360384

EP3360384 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BETWEEN CONNECTED OBJECTS AND GATEWAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crohas, Henri
Avenue Louis Berlaimont 5A
1160 Auderghem / BE
[2018/33]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2018/33]
Application number, filing date16775250.004.10.2016
[2018/33]
WO2016EP73596
Priority number, dateBE2015000562205.10.2015         Original published format: BE 201505622
[2018/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017060207
Date:13.04.2017
Language:FR
[2017/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3360384
Date:15.08.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W48/20, H04W84/10
[2018/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN VERBUNDENEN OBJEKTEN UND GATEWAYS[2018/33]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BETWEEN CONNECTED OBJECTS AND GATEWAYS[2018/33]
French:METHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ENTRES DES OBJETS CONNECTÉS ET DES PASSERELLES[2018/33]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2018National basic fee paid 
04.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
04.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YD]US2014111313  (WILD BEN [US], et al) [YD] 1-20 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] *;
 [Y]US2013121263  (NGUYEN VIET-HUNG [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0019] , [0032] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1,2,4,6 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *;
 [A]US2010232369  (JING XIANGPENG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0037] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,3A,3
 [Y]US2003145092  (FUNATO DAICHI [US], et al) [Y] 21-27 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [Y]WO2009072087  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 21-27 * page 12, line 23 - page 16, line 19; figures 4,5 *
 [A]  - "LoRa MAC Specification;LTN(14)011004_LoRa_MAC_Specifications", ETSI DRAFT; LTN(14)011004_LORA_MAC_SPECIFICATIONS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20140116), vol. ISG, pages 1 - 23, XP014159442 [A] 1-20 * pages 1,2,8 *
by applicantUS2014111313
 US2014219329