Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3281806

EP3281806 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MISHIMA, Sayaka
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-Chome
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/07]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16776424.028.03.2016
[2018/07]
WO2016JP59869
Priority number, dateJP2015008072110.04.2015         Original published format: JP 2015080721
[2018/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016163256
Date:13.10.2016
Language:JA
[2016/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3281806
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.10.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/13
[2018/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2018/07]
English:TIRE[2018/07]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2018/07]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2017Translation filed 
31.10.2017National basic fee paid 
31.10.2017Search fee paid 
31.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/07]
31.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6119744  (TSUKAGOSHI TETSUHITO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 1-6; figures 2a, 2b; example 4; table 1 * [Y] 3-7;
 [X]JP2013244854  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [00035] , [ 00039]; figures 1b, 2b *;
 [Y]US2015083306  (COLBY E BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 3,7 * paragraph [0045]; figure 5 *;
 [Y]JP2015057344  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0052] , [ 0066] , [ 0095]; figures 2, 3, 4, 6, 8 *
International search[XA]US2819751  (FRARY EVAN A, et al) [X] 1 * , column 2, line 48 to column 3, line 24; fig. 2 to 5 (Family: none) * [A] 2-7;
 [YA]JP2014012477  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , paragraphs [0001], [0103] to [0108]; fig. 10, 11 & EP 2871073 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0103] to [0108]; fig. 10, 11 & WO 2014/007316 A1 & CA 2878186 A & AU 2013285902 A & CN 104428144 A * [A] 2, 3, 7;
 [Y]WO2012018128  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-6 * , paragraphs [0063] to [0066]; fig. 7 & US 2013/0168002 A1 paragraphs [0080] to [0083]; fig. 7 & EP 2602128 A1 & CN 103118883 A & JP 5613246 B *;
 [Y]JP2014012478  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 4-6 * , paragraphs [0001], [0087] to [0124]; fig. 6 to 10 & US 2015/0165827 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0106] to [0143]; fig. 6 to 10 & WO 2014/007317 A1 & EP 2873538 A1 & CA 2878200 A & AU 2013285903 A & CN 104411516 A *;
 [Y]WO2012090917  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 4, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0020] to [0042]; fig. 2 to 6 & US 2013/0276947 A1 paragraphs [0001], [0031] to [0055]; fig. 2 to 6 & EP 2660079 A1 & CN 103260903 A & JP 5650761 B *;
 [A]WO2008114668  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0038001 A1 & WO 2008/114668 A1 & EP 2141031 A1 & KR 10-2009-0113332 A & CN 101631686 A & JP 2013-249065 A & JP 5374362 B *;
 [A]JP2012061899  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH03276802  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008222007  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *