Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3281806 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3281806



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 308
13.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.01.2020 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
20.09.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.09.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.09.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.09.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
20.09.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 38
09.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Description Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.02.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
12.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
30.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.07.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.07.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
24.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
24.07.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 6
31.01.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
17.01.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.10.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Description Search / examination 27
31.10.2017 Drawings Search / examination 8
31.10.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.10.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
24.10.2017 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
18.08.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
31.10.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
13.10.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.10.2016 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
13.10.2016 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 32