Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3281806


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.01.2020 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.01.2020 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.11.2018 First examination report
30.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
15.06.2018 Change: Validation states published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
15.06.2018 Change - extension states published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
27.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2018 Supplementary search report published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
26.01.2018 Change - classification published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
12.01.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
12.01.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
12.01.2018 Request for examination filed published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
22.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2017 Amendment by applicant
31.10.2017 Change - representative
31.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
14.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication