Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3350931

EP3350931 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE TRANSMISSION OF VIDEO DATA STREAMS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.03.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vogo
101 Place Duhem
Immeuble les Centuries 2
34000 Montpellier / FR
[2018/30]
Inventor(s)01 / KEIFLIN, Pierre
256 Enclos des Flamants roses
34130 Carnon / FR
02 / CARNIEL, Christophe
536 Chemin des Hirondelles
34170 Castelnau Le Lez / FR
03 / DEDISSE, Daniel
324 rue de la Ducque
34730 Prades Le Lez / FR
 [2018/30]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/30]
Application number, filing date16777730.915.09.2016
[2018/30]
WO2016FR52331
Priority number, dateFR2015005867016.09.2015         Original published format: FR 1558670
[2018/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017046528
Date:23.03.2017
Language:FR
[2017/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3350931
Date:25.07.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017
[2018/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/37, H04L1/18, H04N19/895, H04N21/6405, H04N21/6408, H04N21/6375, H04N21/438
[2018/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VIDEODATENSTRÖMEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK[2018/30]
English:METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE TRANSMISSION OF VIDEO DATA STREAMS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK[2018/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE TRANSMISSION DE FLUX DE DONNÉES VIDÉO DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL[2018/30]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2018National basic fee paid 
08.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/30]
08.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2008006014  (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [I] 1 * page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 6 * * page 7, line 1 * * page 9, line 1 - line 11 * * page 10, line 10 * * page 12, line 7 - line 21 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 21 * * page 17, line 18 - page 18, line 17 * * page 25, line 3 - page 26, line 6 * * figures 5,6,8 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]US2007153898  (YIM CHANG HOON [KR]) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2012054570  (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]KR100860770B  (ZOOINNET [KR]; NAT COMPUTERIZATION AGENCY [KR]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1,2,5,7 *;
 [A]US2002114283  (LEE JACK YIU-BUN [HK]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] - [0029] * * figures 1,2A *
 [Y]  - WUTTIPONG KUMWILAISAK ET AL, "Spatial error concealment with sequence-aligned texture modeling and adaptive directional recovery", JOURNAL OF VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE REPRESENTATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC, US, vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JVCIR.2010.12.002, ISSN 1047-3203, (20101207), pages 164 - 177, (20101213), XP028137413 [Y] 2-4 * page 164 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvcir.2010.12.002
 [A]  - ZHI LI ET AL, "Forward and retransmitted Systematic Lossy Error Protection for IPTV video multicast", PACKET VIDEO WORKSHOP, 2009. PV 2009. 17TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090511), ISBN 978-1-4244-4651-3, pages 1 - 9, XP031483135 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, column r - page 2, column l * * page 3 *