Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3356616

EP3356616 - ILLUMINATED COVERING SYSTEM AND PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/32]ILLUMINATED CERAMIC TILE AND PRODUCTION METHOD
[2019/13]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hofer, Robert
Kühwiesen 13a
8181 St. Ruprecht an der Raab / AT
For all designated states
Christandl, Dieter
Bismarckgasse 4/3
8160 Weiz / AT
For all designated states
Christandl, Josef
Im Angerfeld 173
8181 St. Ruprecht/Raab / AT
[2018/32]
Inventor(s)01 / HAIDER, Alexander
Florianigasse 10/1/4
1080 Wien / AT
02 / FISCHER, Oliver
Margarethendamm 16/1
6971 Hard / AT
 [2018/32]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2018/32]
Application number, filing date16778201.026.09.2016
[2018/32]
WO2016EP01601
Priority number, dateDE20152006801U29.09.2015         Original published format: DE 202015006801 U
[2018/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017054918
Date:06.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3356616
Date:08.08.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/14, F21V33/00, F21Y105/00
[2018/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/32]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTETE VERKLEIDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2019/13]
English:ILLUMINATED COVERING SYSTEM AND PRODUCTION METHOD[2019/13]
French:SYSTÊME DE REVÊTEMENT ÉCLAIRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/13]
Former [2018/32]BELEUCHTETE KERAMIKFLIESE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG
Former [2018/32]ILLUMINATED CERAMIC TILE AND PRODUCTION METHOD
Former [2018/32]CARREAU CÉRAMIQUE ÉCLAIRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase19.04.2018National basic fee paid 
19.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/32]
19.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201803   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE102007046873  (ZWEVERINK BIRGIT [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,8 * figures 4-6, 10, 20 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0080] * [Y] 2,4-6;
 [Y]US2008019121  (LY HUNG P [US]) [Y] 2,4-6,10 * figures 19-20,26 * * claim 15 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0065] *;
 [XY]AU2007278700B  (GUANGDONG DONGPENG CERAMIC CO) [X] 9 * figures 1-2,7 * * page 3, paragraph 1. - paragraph 2. * * page 9, paragraph 2. * [Y] 10
by applicantDE202009016078U
 DE202004000810U
 DE29511741U