blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3360187

EP3360187 - SYSTEM FOR ELECTROLYSING WATER (SOEC) OR FUEL-CELL STACK (SOFC) OPERATING UNDER PRESSURE, THE REGULATION OF WHICH IS IMPROVED. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2018/33]
Inventor(s)01 / CHATROUX, André
3 Chemin de la Plaine de Fures
38210 Tullins / FR
02 / GOUSSEAU, Georges
16 rue du Hameau aux fenêtres
38210 Moirans / FR
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Cabinet Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/33]Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date16778780.305.10.2016
[2018/33]
WO2016EP73727
Priority number, dateFR2015005950406.10.2015         Original published format: FR 1559504
[2018/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017060267
Date:13.04.2017
Language:FR
[2017/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3360187
Date:15.08.2018
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3360187
Date:26.06.2019
Language:FR
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2017
ClassificationIPC:H01M8/04089, H01M8/04746, H01M8/0438, C25B1/04, C25B1/08, C25B1/10, C25B9/20, // H01M8/124
[2019/08]
CPC:
H01M8/04104 (EP,US); C25B1/04 (EP,US); C25B15/02 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US); H01M8/04432 (EP,US); H01M8/04708 (US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US); H01M8/04783 (EP,US); H01M8/04992 (US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US); H01M8/04402 (US); H01M8/0441 (US);
H01M8/04425 (US); Y02E60/36 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/33]H01M8/04089, H01M8/04746, H01M8/0438, C25B15/02, H01M8/124, C25B1/04, C25B9/18, B01L1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR ELEKTROLYSE EINES WASSER- (SOEC) ODER BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPELS (SOFC) MIT BETRIEB UNTER DRUCK MIT VERBESSERTER REGELUNG[2018/33]
English:SYSTEM FOR ELECTROLYSING WATER (SOEC) OR FUEL-CELL STACK (SOFC) OPERATING UNDER PRESSURE, THE REGULATION OF WHICH IS IMPROVED.[2018/33]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU (SOEC) OU PILE À COMBUSTIBLE (SOFC) À FONCTIONNEMENT SOUS PRESSION DONT LA RÉGULATION EST AMÉLIORÉE[2019/08]
Former [2018/33]SYSTEME D'ELECTROLYSE DE L'EAU (SOEC) OU PILE A COMBUSTIBLE (SOFC) A FONCTIONNEMENT SOUS PRESSION DONT LA REGULATION EST AMELIOREE
Entry into regional phase07.05.2018National basic fee paid 
07.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
07.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2019Fee for grant paid
16.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.10.2016
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MK26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE05.10.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2021/34]HU05.10.2016
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
MT26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE05.10.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2021/32]HU05.10.2016
AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE05.10.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2021/26]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CY26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE05.10.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/46]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IE05.10.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/37]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SI26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU05.10.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/35]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
LU05.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS20.03.2020
Former [2020/29]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
MC26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS20.03.2020
Former [2020/24]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
PL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
IS20.03.2020
Former [2020/17]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
TR26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
SM26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
IS26.10.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
EE26.06.2019
ES26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
SK26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL26.06.2019
AT26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RO26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
PT28.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2002081471  (KEEGAN KEVIN R [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,9* paragraphs [0001] , [0 13] , [0 20] , [0 49] - [0053]; claims 1-3, 6, 17-19 *;
 [AD]  - STEPHANIE SEIDLER ET AL, "Pressurized solid oxide fuel cells: Experimental studies and modeling", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, CH, (20101007), vol. 196, no. 17, doi:10.1016/j.jpowsour.2010.09.100, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 7195 - 7202, XP055260130 [AD] 1-11 * abrégé; passage "3.1 Experimental details";; figures 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2010.09.100
 [AD]  - J E O'brien ET AL, "High Temperature Electrolysis Pressurized Experiment Design, Operation, and Results", Idaho Falls, Idaho 83415, USA, (20120913), URL: https://inldigitallibrary.inl.gov/sti/5516323.pdf, (20160321), XP055260106 [AD] 1,4,9 * passage "2. Pressurized Test Facility", particulièrement "2.1 Process Details";; figure 1 *
 [A]  - X. SUN ET AL, "Performance Characterization of Solid Oxide Cells Under High Pressure", FUEL CELLS, DE, (20150702), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1002/fuce.201500020, ISSN 1615-6846, pages 697 - 702, XP055260683 [A] 1,4,9 * abrégé; passage "1. Introduction";; figures 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/fuce.201500020
 [AD]  - JENSEN S H ET AL, "Hydrogen and synthetic fuel production using pressurized solid oxide electrolysis cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., BARKING, GB, vol. 35, no. 18, ISSN 0360-3199, (20100901), pages 9544 - 9549, (20100724), XP027235608 [AD] 1,4,9 * passage "2. Experimental";; figure 2 *
 [AD]  - BURKE A ALAN ET AL, "Pressurized testing of a planar solid oxide fuel cell stack", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (20130910), vol. 38, no. 31, doi:10.1016/J.IJHYDENE.2013.08.058, ISSN 0360-3199, pages 13774 - 13780, XP028730762 [AD] 1,5,9 * passage "2. Experimental method", plus particulièrement "2.3 Pressure control";; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2013.08.058
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.