Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3355780

EP3355780 - HUB FOR DEVICE NAVIGATION WITH OPTICAL SHAPE SENSED GUIDEWIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/32]
Inventor(s)01 / NOONAN, David, Paul
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / FLEXMAN, Molly, Lara
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / REINSTEIN, Aryeh, Leib
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / KAHYA, Neriman, Nicoletta
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / VAN DER MARK, Martinus, Bernardus
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
06 / DENISSEN, Sander, Hans
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
07 / VAN PUTTEN, Eibert, Gerjan
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2018/32]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2018/32]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date16781315.302.10.2016
[2018/32]
WO2016EP73529
Priority number, dateUS201562236172P02.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562236172 P
US201662349298P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349298 P
[2018/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017055620
Date:06.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3355780
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, G01B11/16, A61B34/20
[2018/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/32]
TitleGerman:HUB FÜR VORRICHTUNGSNAVIGATION MIT OPTISCHEM FORMERFASSTEM FÜHRUNGSDRAHT[2018/32]
English:HUB FOR DEVICE NAVIGATION WITH OPTICAL SHAPE SENSED GUIDEWIRE[2018/32]
French:RACCORD POUR NAVIGATION DE DISPOSITIF À FIL-GUIDE DE DÉTECTION DE FORME OPTIQUE[2018/32]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2018National basic fee paid 
02.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/32]
02.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2015049612  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-15,17-25,27-31,38-42,49-52 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 31 * * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 8 * * page 10, line 18 - page 13, line 3 * * page 15, line 7 - page 16, line 28 * * figure - * [I] 5,6,16,26,32-37,43-48
 [X]US2014275997  (CHOPRA PRASHANT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,12,14,15,17-20 * paragraphs [0049] - [0055]; figure 3 *
 [A]WO2014191871  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 32-37,43-48 * page 18, line 21 - page 19, line 6; figure 4 *
 [A]US2004163809  (MAYEU CHRISTOPHER W [US] ET AL) [A] 32-37,43-48 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figure 6 *
 [A]US2007299423  (JONES LLOYD [NZ] ET AL) [A] 5,6,16,26 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *