Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3349677

EP3349677 - ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
23.11.2018Change - extension statespublished on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eximis Surgical LLC
856 Trail Ridge Dr.
Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US
[2018/30]
Inventor(s)01 / GILBERT, James A.
1275 Albion Road
Boulder, Colorado 80305 / US
02 / RUPP, Steven C.
8905 W 64th Ave
Arvada, Colorado 80004 / US
03 / GREGG, William N.
1276 S. Idalia Ct
Superior, Colorado 80027 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Kristin D.
856 Trail Ridge Dr.
Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US
05 / JOHNSON, Dirk
856 Trail Ridge Dr.
Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US
 [2018/30]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/30]
Application number, filing date16781594.315.09.2016
[2018/30]
WO2016US51965
Priority number, dateUS201562220179P17.09.2015         Original published format: US 201562220179 P
US201662279565P15.01.2016         Original published format: US 201662279565 P
US201662327852P26.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662327852 P
[2018/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017048976
Date:23.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3349677
Date:25.07.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017
[2018/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12, A61B18/00
[2018/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/30]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2018/30]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE AND METHODS[2018/30]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL ET PROCÉDÉS[2018/30]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2018National basic fee paid 
13.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/30]
13.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2011087212  (ALDRIDGE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,13,15,30,32,39 * paragraphs [0012] , [0124] , [0126] - [0131] - [0137] - [0138] * * paragraphs [0160] - [0167] - [0172] , [0268] - [0269] - [0274] , [0298] - [0300] * [A] 5,9,11,17,21,23,34,38,40 [I] 2,4,6-8,12,14,16,18-20,22,31,33,35-37;
 [XI]EP0703461  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 30 * column 7, lines 12-15, 44-46 * * column 8, lines 7-42 * [I] 1,13;
 [XI]WO9805286  (KNOWLTON EDWARD W [US]) [X] 30 * page 21, line 16 - page 22, line 1 * [I] 1,13