Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3368196

EP3368196 - ROTARY FILTER ARRANGEMENT HAVING A PLURALITY OF HOLLOW SHAFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH
Werner-Habig-Strasse 1
59302 Oelde / DE
[2018/36]
Inventor(s)01 / GRÖNE, Verena
Hessenknapp 42
59320 Ennigerloh / DE
 [2018/36]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/36]
Application number, filing date16781800.414.10.2016
[2018/36]
WO2016EP74725
Priority number, dateDE20151011827527.10.2015         Original published format: DE102015118275
[2018/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017071975
Date:04.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3368196
Date:05.09.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017
[2018/36]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3368196
Date:28.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01D63/16, C02F1/44
[2018/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTATIONSFILTERANORDNUNG MIT MEHREREN HOHLWELLEN[2018/36]
English:ROTARY FILTER ARRANGEMENT HAVING A PLURALITY OF HOLLOW SHAFTS[2018/36]
French:ENSEMBLE FILTRE TOURNANT DOTÉ DE PLUSIEURS ARBRES CREUX[2018/36]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2018National basic fee paid 
07.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/36]
07.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2019Fee for grant paid
11.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDY]WO0205935  (AAFLOWSYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG [DE]; BLAESE DIETER [DE]; OLAPINSKI HANS [D) [XD] 1,4-12,24 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 11; figure - * [Y] 2,3,13-23
 [Y]US3997447  (BRETON ERNEST J ET AL) [Y] 2,3,14,17,18,20,22,23 * column 6, line 24 - line 68; figures 1,2,5 *
 [Y]JPS5471773  (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [Y] 18,19,21 * abstract *
 [A]WO2011033537  (TMCI PADOVAN S P A [IT]; BORNIA LUCA [IT]) [A] 1,17,18,20,22,23 * abstract *
 [A]JPS6297604  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN; HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO) [A] 1,9,10,15 * abstract *
 [Y]US2011011785  (HERMAN DAVID T [US] ET AL) [Y] 15,16,22,23 * figure 1 *
 [YA]EP1323458  (SCHEPIS ANTHONY [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0022]; figures 2-5 * [A] 11,12
 [YA]US4925557  (AHLBERG JR WALTER F [US] ET AL) [Y] 22,23 * figure 1 * [A] 1,24
 DE102009010484  [ ]
 DE202005018806U  [ ]
 DE69511772T  [ ]
 WO0205935  [ ]