Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3362854

EP3362854 - MICROSTRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MICROSTRUCTURE IN A PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Kassel
Mönchebergstrasse 19
34125 Kassel / DE
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KHUDHAIR, Basim
Wallstrasse 1e
34125 Kassel / DE
02 / VIERECK, Volker
Bungestrasse 8
34131 Kassel / DE
03 / HILLMER, Volker
Korbacher Strasse 36
34132 Kassel / DE
 [2018/34]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/34]
Application number, filing date16782025.707.10.2016
[2018/34]
WO2016EP74047
Priority number, dateDE20151011755615.10.2015         Original published format: DE102015117556
[2018/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017063951
Date:20.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3362854
Date:22.08.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03F1/50, G03F7/40, G03F7/00
[2018/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
TitleGerman:MIKROSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIKROSTRUKTUR IN EINER FOTOLITHOGRAPHIETECHNIK[2018/34]
English:MICROSTRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MICROSTRUCTURE IN A PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY TECHNIQUE[2018/34]
French:MICROSTRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MICROSTRUCTURE DANS LE DOMAINE TECHNIQUE DE LA PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIE[2018/34]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2018National basic fee paid 
13.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
13.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004073379  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 18 - page 9, line 18; figures 1a,1b,2a,2b; claims 1-4,7,8,11 *;
 [A]JPS6161162  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract;; figure figures *;
 [XA]US2002018964  (JEROMINEK HUBERT [CA]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0043] , [0044]; figures 3,6,9A-10G; claim 1 * [A] 1-9;
 [A]CN104849966  (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) [A] 1-10 * see passages in US2016 299 420 A1 *;
 US2016299420  [ ] (WANG MAN [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] - [0021] - [0033] - [0039] - [0049]; figures 2-5; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2013164656  (LEE WOO JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0044] - [0057] - [0079] - [0084]; figures 1-7; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US3507592  (MCLAUGHLIN JOSEPH L) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS6049338  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2005148514  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract; paragraphs [0016] - [0020]; figure 1a to 1f; claim 1 *
by applicantUS6022645
 JP2013238692
 DE10358967