Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3362854


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2018 Change: Validation states published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
21.12.2018 Change - extension states published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
05.12.2018 Amendment by applicant
16.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.07.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
20.07.2018 Request for examination filed published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
25.06.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
13.04.2018 Change - representative
13.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication