Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3368346

EP3368346 - TREAD WITH CONCEALED CAVITIES COMPRISING A WEAR INDICATOR HAVING IMPROVED VISIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Déchaux
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
[2018/44]
Former [2018/36]For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CAMBON, Stéphanie
Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin
DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux
63040 Clermont-ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
02 / MUHLHOFF, Olivier
Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin
DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux
63040 Clermont-ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
 [2018/36]
Representative(s)Diernaz, Christian
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[2018/36]
Application number, filing date16787905.528.10.2016
[2018/36]
WO2016EP76125
Priority number, dateFR2015006037529.10.2015         Original published format: FR 1560375
[2018/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017072318
Date:04.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3368346
Date:05.09.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017
[2018/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3368346
Date:14.08.2019
Language:FR
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/03, B60C11/24
[2018/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LAUFFLÄCHE MIT VERBORGENEN HOHLRÄUMEN MIT EINEM VERSCHLEISSINDIKATOR MIT VERBESSERTER SICHTBARKEIT[2019/11]
English:TREAD WITH CONCEALED CAVITIES COMPRISING A WEAR INDICATOR HAVING IMPROVED VISIBILITY[2018/36]
French:BANDE DE ROULEMENT À CREUX CACHÉS COMPRENANT UN INDICATEUR D'USURE AYANT UNE VISIBILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE[2018/36]
Former [2018/36]LAUFFLÄCHE MIT VERBORGENEN HOHLRÄUMEN MIT EINER VERSCHLEISSANZEIGE MIT VERBESSERTER SICHTBARKEIT
Entry into regional phase29.05.2018National basic fee paid 
29.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/36]
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP2311655  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0032]; figures 7, 8, 16, 17 *
 [A]WO2013115810  (MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]; MICHELIN & CIE [FR]; COLBY E BRUCE [US]; TSIH) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [AD]WO2011039194  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]) [AD] 8 * figures 15a, 15b *
 WO2011039194  [ ]
 EP2311655  [ ]